Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-01305
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 23, 2023 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Sandra Martinez (1)
Represented By
Frances Gail Schroeter
The Schroeter Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 04/23/2023 3:07 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
Arrest of Sandra Martinez (drda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 4/18/2023 as to Sandra Martinez. (ccl)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Sandra Martinez. (ccl)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Sandra Martinez (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Sandra Martinez (1) by Judge Collis White. (ccl)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Collis White as to Sandra Martinez. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Collis White as to Sandra Martinez. (drda)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Collis White:Initial Appearance as to Sandra Martinez held on 4/20/2023 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 4/25/2023 10:00AM before Judge Collis White, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Sandra Martinez (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - M CIENEGA.) (drda)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Frances Gail Schroeter for Sandra Martinez appointed. Signed by Judge Collis White. (ccl)
Related: [-]