Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Douglas R Cole
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:23-cv-01399
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2023 7:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Elford Inc.
Represented By
H. Devon Collins
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Jan Elizabeth Hensel
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Alan Cobb
1570 Isabel Ave.
Columbus, OH 43211
Represented By
Jason E Starling
Willis Spangler Starling
contact info

GPO Apr 25 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wayne Alan Cobb. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, ECF No. 1, be DENIED and that he be ordered to pay the required $402 filing fee within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS if he intends to proceed. Objections to R&R due by 5/9/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 25, 2023. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
GPO Jun 24 2024
ORDER denying without prejudice as moot ECF Nos. 22 Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and 25 Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/24/2024. (cmw)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
52 52 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 04/30 4:32 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Judge Edmund A. Sargus no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 4/30/25. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
51 51 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/24 10:23 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2026 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Settlement Conference set for 5/19/2026 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2026 at 09:00 AM before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Motions in Limine due by 6/1/2026. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 4/24/2025. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 FPTO Form
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
50 50 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 04/23 3:44 PM
ORDER granting49 Motion to Amend the Preliminary Pretrial Order. Primary Expert due by 5/30/2025. Rebuttal Expert due by 6/30/2025. Discovery due by 7/30/2025. Dispositive motions due by 8/29/2025. Mediation Deadline: 7/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/23/2025. (vb)
Related: [-]