New Mexico District Court
Judge:Sarah M Davenport
Referred: Gregory J Fouratt
Case #: 2:23-cv-00345
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2023 7:04 AM MDT
Defendant
Mark Cage
Represented By
Jonlyn M Martinez
Law Firm Of Jonlyn M. Martinez
contact info
Defendant
Eddy County Board of Commissioners
Represented By
Jonlyn M Martinez
Law Firm Of Jonlyn M. Martinez
contact info
Defendant
Jared Rostro
Represented By
Jonlyn M Martinez
Law Firm Of Jonlyn M. Martinez
contact info
Defendant
Eric Threlkeld
Represented By
Jonlyn M Martinez
Law Firm Of Jonlyn M. Martinez
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Sanchez
Represented By
Ramon A. Soto
The Soto Law Office, LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge David H. Urias GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 3 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (cmm)
GPO Jul 26 2024
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt granting 19 Motion to Stay (mjm)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
53 53 2 pgs NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Jason Sanchez re50 Opposed MOTION Rule 56(d) Motion to Conduct Limited Discovery, and Request for Denial or Deferment of Defendants' Amended Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Response, and Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Stay re47 filed by Jason Sanchez (Soto, Ramon)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
52 52 8 pgs REPLY to Response to Motion re47 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment ,48 Opposed MOTION to Stay re47 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment ,50 Opposed MOTION Rule 56(d) Motion to Conduct Limited Discovery, and Request for Denial or Deferment of Defendants' Amended Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Response, and Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Stay re47 filed by Jason Sanchez. (Soto, Ramon)
Related: [-]