Original Case: 1:22-cv-00149

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-00653
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2023
Terminated:Aug 03, 2023
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2023 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
iFinex Inc.
Represented By
Jason P. Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Daniel Isaacs
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Alexandra Wan Wang
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BFXNA Inc.
Represented By
Jason P. Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Daniel Isaacs
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Alexandra Wan Wang
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BFXWW Inc.
Represented By
Jason P. Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Daniel Isaacs
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Alexandra Wan Wang
Morrison Cohen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ephraim Atwal, M.D.
Represented By
Anna Mercado Clark
Phillips Lytle LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/04/2023 4:46 AM EDT
Thursday, April 20, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ephraim Atwal, FILED. [3504260] [23-653] [Entered: 04/24/2023 04:54 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 03/22/2023, RECEIVED.[3504267] [23-653] [Entered: 04/24/2023 04:58 PM]
Related: [-]