Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-08769
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2023
Terminated:Aug 22, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Oct 22, 2023 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
EDWIN GONZALEZ
Represented By
JASON BENJAMIN WOLF
Parafinczuk & Wolf - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 04/25 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum- NJDC by EDWIN GONZALEZ (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/25 9:30 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/25 9:30 AM
COMPLAINT AND TRIAL JURY DEMAND against 3M COMPANY, filed by EDWIN GONZALEZ. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]