Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:23-cv-01780
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2023
Terminated:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance
Represented By
Mark Thomas Dietrichs
Swift Currie Mcghee & Hiers, LLP
contact info
Christopher Wood
Swift Currie Mcghee & Hiers
contact info
Alexander Andrei Mikhalevsky
Swift, Currie, Mcghee & Hiers, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Blue Skies Construction and Development, Inc.
Interested Party
Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc., ISAOA
Plaintiff
Charles Jones
Represented By
Foster Peebles
Huggins Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Michael Davis Turner
Huggins Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Donna Jones
Represented By
Foster Peebles
Huggins Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Michael Davis Turner
Huggins Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/07 3:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Charles Jones, Donna Jones. (Peebles, Foster)
Related: [-]
40 40 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 08/07 1:46 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On June 7, 2024, this Court ordered the parties to file appropriate dismissal documents within sixty days Doc.39 . To date, the parties have not filed the dismissal documents or moved for additional time to finalize their settlement. No later than August 21, 2024, the parties are ORDERED to show cause, if any, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to obey an order of this Court. If no response is filed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this case upon the expiration of the relevant time period. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/7/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 08/07 10:14 AM
Submission of39 Order to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 08/07 5:52 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING41 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Show Cause Order is DISCHARGED. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
39 39 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 06/07 12:02 PM
ORDER. In light of the pending settlement, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for docket management purposes. Administrative closure will not prejudice the rights of the parties to this litigation in any manner nor preclude the filing of documents. If settlement negotiations fail, the parties need only file a motion to reopen the case within the time period covered by this Order. The parties are ORDERED to file the appropriate documents to dispose of the case within sixty days. Absent an extension or further order of the Court, if no request to reopen the case is made within sixty days, the Court may dismiss the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/7/2024. (bgt)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 06/07 12:03 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
38 38 minutes Telephone Conference Thu 06/06 2:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: Telephone Conference held on 6/6/2024. The case is settled. (Tape #FTR)(nmb)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 06/06 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance (Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 06/06 2:22 PM
Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard terminated. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
36 36 4 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Wed 05/15 11:43 AM
ORDER scheduling Mediation. Mediation Hearing set for 6/6/2024 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 5/15/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Settlement Judge Tue 05/07 2:53 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Settlement Judge Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. The briefing deadlines on the pending motion are HEREBY STAYED pending the completion of mediation. Mediation shall occur before 6/6/2024. If mediation fails, the parties shall notify the Court within 1 week of reaching an impasse. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/6/2024. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
34 34 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/03 5:07 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance.(Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts Statement of Material Facts,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex A - Depo of Charles Jones,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex B - Depo of Donna Jones,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex C - Depo of Whitney Freeman,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex D - Depo of Michael Allen,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex E - Depo of Mark Higginbotham,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex F - Part 1 of State Farm Policy,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex F - Part 2 of State Farm Policy,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex F - Part 3 of State Farm Policy,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex G - Part 1 of Photos,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex G - Part 2 of Photos,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex H - Email Correspondence
Friday, April 12, 2024
33 33 discov Certificate of Service Fri 04/12 2:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Discovery by Charles Jones, Donna Jones.(Peebles, Foster)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/05 5:35 PM
NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition (Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
31 31 notice Notice to Take Deposition Fri 03/29 3:41 PM
Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative filed by Charles Jones, Donna Jones (Peebles, Foster)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
30 30 discov Certificate of Service Mon 03/18 4:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance.(Wood, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
29 29 notice Notice to Take Deposition Fri 03/15 3:07 PM
Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Whitney Freeman filed by Charles Jones, Donna Jones (Huggins, J.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 03/15 3:12 PM
The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint Third Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery [Doc.28]. For good cause shown, the Court will grant a final extension of the discovery period and the Motion is GRANTED IN PART. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that discovery is extended through and including April 12, 2024. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than May 3, 2024. The parties should endeavor to take Mr. Dunn's deposition by April 12, 2024, but if not, by April 30, 2024, at latest. The parties are warned that summary judgement deadlines will not be extended based on the date of Mr. Dunns deposition. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 3/15/2024. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 03/12 1:34 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance. (Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
27 27 notice Notice to Take Deposition Mon 03/11 12:21 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) Corporate Representative filed by Charles Jones, Donna Jones (Peebles, Foster)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice to Take Deposition Mon 03/11 12:20 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Whitney Freeman filed by Charles Jones, Donna Jones (Peebles, Foster)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice to Take Deposition Mon 03/11 10:02 AM
Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Charles Jones filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance (Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice to Take Deposition Mon 03/11 10:00 AM
Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Donna Marie Jones filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance (Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
23 23 notice Notice to Take Deposition Tue 02/27 1:50 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Southeast Restoration Group of Georgia, Inc. filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance (Wood, Christopher)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice to Take Deposition Tue 02/27 1:49 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Blue Skies Constructions and Development, Inc. filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance (Wood, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 02/16 4:36 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 3/20/2024. Motions due by 4/20/2024. The joint19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is GRANTED IN PART. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that discovery is extended for an additional days, through and including March 20, 2024. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than April 19, 2024. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 2/16/2024. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
21 21 notice Notice to Take Deposition Thu 02/15 5:30 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Charles Jones filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance (Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice to Take Deposition Thu 02/15 5:29 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Donna Marie Jones filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance (Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 02/08 2:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance.(Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 11/14 9:18 AM
For good cause shown, the18 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that discovery is extended through and including February 20, 2024. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than March 21, 2024. Given the length of this extension, future extensions are unlikely. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/14/2023. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 11/13 2:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance.(Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 02, 2023
17 17 misc Leave of Absence Mon 10/02 1:49 PM
Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 16 2023, October 17 2023, October 18 2023, October 19 2023, October 31 2023, November 2 2023, Nove3mber 3 2023, November 22 2023, November 23 2023, November 24 2023, December 7 2023, December 8 2023, December 9 2023, December 10 2023, December 25 2023, December 26 2023, December 27 2023, December 28 2023, December 29 2023, January 1 2024, January 2 2024, January 3 2024, January 12 2024, January 13 2024, January 14 2024, January 15 2024, February 19 2024, February 20 2024, March 11 2024, March 12 2024, March 13 2024, March 14 2024, March 15 2024, by Alexander Andrei Mikhalevsky. (Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 09/26 4:42 PM
Because Defendant will continue to be represented by counsel, the15 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Mark T. Dietrichs as counsel of record in this case. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/26/23. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/25 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Andrei Mikhalevsky on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance (Mikhalevsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Withdraw As Attorney Mon 09/25 12:06 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Mark Thomas Dietrichs as Attorneyby State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance.(Dietrichs, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Client's Consent to Withdraw as Counsel,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, June 30, 2023
14 14 discov Certificate of Service Fri 06/30 3:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Discovery Responses by Charles Jones, Donna Jones.(Peebles, Foster)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Fri 06/30 1:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance.(Dietrichs, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 06/05 11:50 AM
Clerk's Notation re11 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/26 2:55 PM
NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Companys Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Upon Non-Parties (Wood, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/18 4:49 PM
Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charles Jones, Donna Jones. (Peebles, Foster)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/18 4:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charles Jones, Donna Jones. (Peebles, Foster)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Initial Disclosures Thu 05/18 4:40 PM
Initial Disclosures by Charles Jones, Donna Jones.(Peebles, Foster)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/17 11:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery shall open on 5/20/2023 and close on 11/20/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2023. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/17/2023. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
7 7 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 05/16 3:46 PM
Initial Disclosures by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance.(Dietrichs, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
6 6 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Mon 05/15 12:32 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance. (Dietrichs, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 05/05 9:50 AM
Clerk's Notation re5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/27 1:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Bank, FSB, Other Affiliate State Farm Florida Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Oglesby Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Top Layer Reinsurance, Ltd., Other Affiliate State Farm Companies Foundation, Other Affiliate Insurance Placement Services, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm International Services, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm Finance Corporation of Canada, Other Affiliate SF Insurance Placement Corporation of Canada, Other Affiliate MICP, LLC, Other Affiliate SFCL, LLC, Other Affiliate SASAP, LLC, Other Affiliate MountainBrook, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoover Ross Bridge, LLC, Other Affiliate SF Risk Management Group, LLC, Other Affiliate SRL Portfolio, LLC, Other Affiliate 4eightyfive, LLC, Other Affiliate RS Realty, LLC, Other Affiliate New Jersey Kimball, LLC, Other Affiliate BCS Office Investments One, LP, Other Affiliate St. Louis Market, LLC, Other Affiliate Town Square Retail, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlanta Office Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Tempe Office Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlanta Office Ph I, LLC, Other Affiliate EMVLP, LLC, Other Affiliate Austin Jack, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Mac Jack, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack IV, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack V, LLC, Other Affiliate Idaho - Brockton, LP, Other Affiliate City Lights on Fig, LP, Other Affiliate SFSV Hill Airport Commerce, LP, Other Affiliate Durham Office Headquarters Buildings, LLC, Other Affiliate DRT, LP, Other Affiliate State Farm Realty Investment Company, Other Affiliate State Farm International Holding Company, Other Affiliate Foreign Securities Trust No. 1, Other Affiliate State Farm EM Equity Trust, Other Affiliate State Farm Lloyds, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm Liquidity Pool LLC, Other Affiliate BCS Office Investments Two, LP, Other Affiliate State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, Other Affiliate State Farm Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Life and Accident Assurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Investment Management Corp., Other Affiliate State Farm Equity and Bond Fund (Symbol: SLBAX), Other Affiliate State Farm International Index Fund (Symbol: SIIAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small Cap Index Fund (Symbol: SMIAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small/Mid Cap Equity Fund (Symbol: SFSAX), Other Affiliate Centennial Park III, LLC, Other Affiliate BCS Office West Land Investments, LP, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack II, LLC LLC, Other Affiliate Idaho - Pacific, LLC, Other Affiliate State Farm International Equity Fund (Symbol: SFFAX), Other Affiliate State Farm General Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance. (Dietrichs, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
4 4 discov Certificate of Service Wed 04/26 11:53 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance.(Dietrichs, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Wed 04/26 9:40 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/26/23. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 04/25 9:04 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance. Originally filed in the Superior Court of Gwinnett County. Discovery ends on 9/18/2023.(jra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 US District Court Answer
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 04/25 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BGANDC-12543705)(jra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Certificate,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet