Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Case #: 1:23-cv-01850
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2023
Terminated:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2023 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Dipito LLC
Plaintiff
Pentagon Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Michael A. Graziano
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, Llc-Dc
contact info
Jennifer Theobold McLean
Mozley, Finlayson & Loggins LLP
contact info
Charles David Hailey
Mozley, Finlayson & Loggins LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
24 24 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/20 2:26 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dipito LLC d/b/a SD Motorwerks re14 Order. (ane)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/20 2:18 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dipito LLC d/b/a SD Motorwerks re16 Order,17 Order-Default Judgment. (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
22 22 misc Abstract of Judgment Tue 05/13 9:18 AM
Abstract of Judgment Issued in the amount of $273,347.28. One (1) Original and Two (2) Certified Copies returned via USPS. (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
21 21 misc Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment Tue 05/13 9:14 AM
Praecipe for Abstract of Judgment by Pentagon Federal Credit Union.(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Abstract of Judgment
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
20 20 misc Certification of Judgment Wed 10/09 1:56 PM
CERTIFICATION of Judgment to be registered in another district (1 copy) of 7/29/2024 Judgment against Defendant Dipito LLC in the amount of $255,384.13 plus $17,963.15 in attorney's fees for a total amount of $273,347.28. 1 copy of certification of judgment returned to counsel in SASE. (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
19 19 misc Mail Returned Tue 08/27 9:03 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dipito LLC d/b/a SD Motorwerks 7030 Carroll Rd San Diego, CA 92121 re16 Order,17 Default Judgment. (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
18 18 misc Mail Returned Tue 07/30 12:33 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dipito LLC d/b/a SD Motorwerks 7030 Carroll Rd San Diego, CA 92121 re14 Order. (ane)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 07/30 8:14 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dipito LLC re16 Order,17 Default Judgment. (ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
17 17 order Judgment - Default Mon 07/29 6:08 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff Pentagon Federal Credit Union against Defendant Dipito LLC in the following amounts: $41,456.45 in connection with the Smith Contract, $50,584.57 in connection with the Okudan contract, $62,965.16 in connection with the Morris Contract, and $100,377.95 in connection with the Romero contract. Plaintiff is also awarded $17,963.15 in attorney's fees, costs, and expenses of litigation. (acm)
Related: [-]
16 16 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 07/29 6:00 PM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's13 Motion for Default Judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter default judgment against Dipito LLC d/b/a SD Motorwerks and in favor of Pentagon Federal Credit Union in the following amounts: $41,456.45 on the Smith Contract, $50,584.57 on the Okudan contract, $62,965.16 on the Morris Contract, and $100,377.95 on the Romero contract. Plaintiff is also awarded $17,963.15 in attorneys fees, costs, and expenses of litigation. As no matters remain pending before the Court, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 7/29/2024. (acm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 07/29 6:12 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (acm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Filing Tue 07/09 12:31 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits Pursuant to Order Dated July 3, 2024 by Pentagon Federal Credit Union(McLean, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Indirect Lending Dealer Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- the Smith Contract,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- the Smith Title Guaranty,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- the Okudan Contract,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5- the Okudan Title Guaranty,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6- the Morris Contract,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7- the Morris Title Guaranty,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8- the Romero Contract,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9- the Romero Title Guaranty
Friday, July 05, 2024
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/05 10:30 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dipito LLC re14 Order. Order mailed to two (2) addresses found within Order. (ces)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 07/05 10:30 AM
ORDER: PenFed is DIRECTED to file by July 12, 2024, a copy of the indirect lending dealer agreement for the Court's review. PenFed is further DIRECTED to file by July 12, 2024, copies of the title guaranty for each of the four contracts on which it seeks damages because of Defendant's alleged breach. If the Court concludes that this evidence is not sufficient to support the entry of default judgment, it will schedule a hearing. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to Defendant. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 7/3/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 10/30 1:32 PM
Submission of12 Order to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
13 13 motion Default Judgment Thu 10/26 5:04 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Dipito LLC d/b/a SD Motorwerks by Pentagon Federal Credit Union.(McLean, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Declaration of JTM,
Att: 2 Exhibit A1 - Invoices,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Declaration of CK,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 10/10 4:39 PM
ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to file, on or before October 27, 2023, either a well-supported motion for default judgment, or a notice explaining why Plaintiff is not seeking default at this time. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the Court on October 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 10/10/2023. (ane)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
utility Clerks Entry of Default Fri 08/18 2:20 PM
Clerks Entry of Default as to Dipito LLC (ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
11 11 motion Default Judgment Mon 08/14 3:24 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Dipito LLC D/B/A SD Motorwerks by Pentagon Federal Credit Union.(McLean, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Jennifer T. McLean,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Proposed Entry of Default
Thursday, May 18, 2023
10 10 service Return of Service Executed Thu 05/18 2:48 PM
Return of Service Executed by Pentagon Federal Credit Union. Dipito LLC served on 5/7/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (McLean, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 05/03 10:53 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Dipito LLC. (ane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
8 8 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/02 4:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Graziano. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 5/2/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Proposed Summons Tue 05/02 3:48 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Pentagon Federal Credit Union (McLean, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Mon 05/01 7:59 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:5 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael A. Graziano Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12563522). Attorney Michael A. Graziano added appearing on behalf of Pentagon Federal Credit Union. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Fri 04/28 3:13 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/28/2023. (sap)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/28 8:41 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Michael A. Graziano Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12563522).by Pentagon Federal Credit Union. (McLean, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
4 4 misc Letter re:83.1 Wed 04/26 7:11 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michael A. Graziano. Clerk to follow-up by 5/8/2023. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/25 1:12 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pentagon Federal Credit Union. (McLean, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/25 12:08 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Dipito LLC. (jra)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/25 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Pentagon Federal Credit Union. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12551582)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet