New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00179
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 26, 2023 3:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Julian Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
Benjamin Zev Yaster
Federal Defenders Of New York, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joshua Buchanan Dugan
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/30/2024 3:58 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
1 1 11 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to Julian Gonzalez (1). (FC) [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealing Cover Sheet
Monday, March 27, 2023
Attorney update in case as to Julian Gonzalez. Attorney Benjamin Zev Yaster for Julian Gonzalez added. (SY) [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Arraignment as to Julian Gonzalez on the Complaint held on 3/27/2023, Initial Appearance as to Julian Gonzalez held on 3/27/2023, Attorney Appointment of federal defender Ben Yaster for the defendant. AUSA Joshua Duggan.(FTR Log #2;46-3;14.) Detention hearing held. Gov't opposed to bail based on risk of flight. Defense presented a bail package. Court agrees with the gov't and enters a detention order without prejudice. Defendant waived preliminary hearing. Rule 5f order read into the record. (SY) [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order to Unseal Case as to Julian Gonzalez.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/27/2023. (SY) [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Letter MOTION to Remand to custody pending trial by USA as to Julian Gonzalez. (Dugan, Joshua) [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION without prejudice as to Julian Gonzalez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/27/2023. (SY) [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Julian Gonzalez (SY) [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER: This order is entered pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) to confirm the prosecution's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. as to Julian Gonzalez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/27/2023. (SY) [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER granting4 Motion to Remand as to Julian Gonzalez (1)Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/27/2023. (SY) [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr: For a contested Bond Hearing as to Julian Gonzalez held on 4/14/2023. AUSA Joshua Dugan; Defense Benjamin Yaster. Defense presented a bail application as stated on the record; the Government opposed as stated on the record. The Court granted bail in the amount of $500,000.00 with conditions as stated on the record. The defendant was released. (FTR Log #11:22-12:02.) (MS) [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs ORDER for the acceptance of cash bail is to be posted with the Clerk of the Court by Wednesday April 19, 2023 as to Julian Gonzalez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 4/14/2023. (MS) (MS). [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/24/2023) Cash bail posted
11 11 3 pgs REDACTION by Julian Gonzalez to 9 1 - Sealed Docket Entry AND Document CR, Order Setting Conditions of Release (MS) [1:23-mj-00257-JRC]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
12 12 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Julian Gonzalez (1) count(s) 1. (IH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet