Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:14-cr-00382
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2014
Terminated:Mar 05, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Mar 14, 2015 2:19 PM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David M. Chaiken
U.S. Attorneys Office - Atl
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Gregg A. Kaminsky (1)
Terminated: 03/05/2015
2795 Peachtree Road, #2006
Atlanta, GA 30305
Represented By
Wilmer Parker, III
Maloy Jenkins Parker
contact info


1. How Cheating on Your Taxes Can Lead to Prison (wsj.com)
Submitted Sat 03/14/2015
Docket last updated: 03/14/2015 2:19 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 14, 2014
Case as to Gregg A. Kaminsky reassigned to Judge Unassigned. Case initially assigned to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard in error (ryc).
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs INFORMATION as to Gregg A. Kaminsky (1) count(s) 1. (ryc)
Related: [-]
2 2 Defendant Information Sheet as to Gregg A. Kaminsky. (ryc)
Related: [-]