Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:23-cv-60766
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2023
Terminated:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 23, 2023 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Jesse Burton
Represented By
Barry Steven Mittelberg
Barry S. Mittelberg, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Kashonda Burton
Represented By
Barry Steven Mittelberg
Barry S. Mittelberg, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Innovative Software Solution, Inc.
a Florida corporation 1800 NW 15th Ave Ste 135
Pompano Beach, FL 33069
Represented By
Murray Hudson
Murray Hudson, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 13, 2024
44 44 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 05/13 10:26 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Motions terminated:41 Agreed MOTION in Limine filed by Innovative Software Solution, Inc.. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
43 43 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Fri 05/10 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Innovative Software Solution, Inc. (Hudson, Murray)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
42 42 1 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Mon 04/29 9:22 AM
ORDER: Calendar Call reset for 5/15/2024 at 2:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
41 41 motion In Limine Mon 04/01 4:42 PM
Agreed MOTION in Limine by Innovative Software Solution, Inc.. (Hudson, Murray)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 03/15 10:56 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE dismissing as moot35 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
39 39 misc Stipulation Thu 03/14 11:11 AM
STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal of Counterclaim by Jesse Burton, Kashonda Burton (Mittelberg, Barry)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
38 38 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 03/08 12:51 PM
ORDER re35 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Innovative Software Solution, Inc. The Defendants shall file an opposing memorandum of law to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count I or Show Cause Response due by 3/14/2024. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/7/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
37 37 order Order Striking Tue 02/20 12:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REGARDING34 Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition and36 Defendants' Notice of Taking Depositions. This cause comes before the Court upon a review of the record. Pursuant to the Local Rules, "[i]nitial and expert disclosures and the following discovery requests, responses, objections, notices or any associated proof of service shall not be filed until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders their filing: (1) deposition transcripts; (2) interrogatories; (3) requests for documents, electronically stored information or things, or to permit entry upon land; (4) requests for admission; and (5) notices of taking depositions or notices of serving subpoenas." S.D. Fla. L.R. 26.1(b). Therefore, ECF Nos.34 and36 are STRICKEN . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/20/2024. (sd01) Modified text on 2/20/2024 per Chambers (bb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/16 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Taking Depositions by Jesse Burton, Kashonda Burton (Mittelberg, Barry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
35 35 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 02/14 3:11 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Defendant's Counterclaim by Innovative Software Solution, Inc.. (Hudson, Murray)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
34 34 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 02/13 6:05 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kashonda Burton, Jesse Burton by Innovative Software Solution, Inc..(Hudson, Murray)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
33 33 adr Mediation Report Fri 02/09 2:12 PM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Mediator Karen Evans-Putney. Disposition: Case did not settle. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. Filed by karen evans.(Evans, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
32 32 adr Mediation Report Wed 01/24 9:28 AM
MEDIATION REPORT by Mediator Karen Evans-Putney. Disposition: Adjourned. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. Filed by karen evans.(Evans, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
31 31 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 01/05 4:44 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by Innovative Software Solution, Inc.. (Hudson, Murray)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
30 30 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Fri 12/15 2:21 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Innovative Software Solution, Inc. by Jesse Burton, Kashonda Burton. (Mittelberg, Barry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
29 29 order Order Scheduling Mediation Wed 12/06 1:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Karen Evans- Putney, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 1/23/2024 at 2:00 PM. All parties and counsel must attend. Mediation Report is due by 1/26/2024. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/6/2023. (jgr)
Related: [-]
28 28 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Wed 12/06 10:51 AM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added karen evans as Mediator.(Hudson, Murray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
27 27 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Tue 11/28 10:35 AM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jesse Burton, Kashonda Burton filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Innovative Software Solution, Inc..(Hudson, Murray)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 11/27 3:18 PM
ORDER re24 Joint Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties to conduct Settlement Conference in Lieu of Mediation. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Joint Motion (DE24 ) is DENIED. The parties shall by December 1, 2023, submit a proposed order scheduling mediation or request the Clerk of Court to assign a certified mediator on a blind rotation basis in accordance with the Court's initial Scheduling Order (DE22 ). Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
25 25 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/27 3:13 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is denied except with respect to Count I of the Amended Complaint, which is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff is to refile an amended complaint reflecting this order within twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
24 24 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 11/21 12:50 PM
Joint Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties to conduct Settlement Conference in Lieu of Mediation . Filed by Innovative Software Solution, Inc. (Hudson, Murray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 16, 2023
23 23 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 11/16 10:15 AM
ORDER. ORDERED that the parties shall by November 21, 2023, submit a proposed order scheduling mediation or request the Clerk of Court to assign a certified mediator on a blind rotation basis in accordance with the Court's initial Scheduling Order (DE22 ). Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/16/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
22 22 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 10/02 3:36 PM
Order Setting Trial And Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge: Jury Trial set for 5/20/2024 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal. Calendar Call set for 5/15/2024 10:30 AM held via ZOOM before Judge Raag Singhal. Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2023. Discovery due by 1/31/2024. Expert Discovery due by 1/31/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 11/16/2023. In Limine Motions due by 3/20/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2024. Motions due by 2/14/2024. Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/3/2024. All discovery matters are referred to Judge Alicia O. Valle. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
4 4 NOTICE by Innovative Software Solution, Inc. re 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Civil Cover Sheet (Hudson, Murray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (rbe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Jesse Burton, Kashonda Burton. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number CFLSDC-16568771, filed by Innovative Software Solution, Inc..(Hudson, Murray)
Related: [-]