Original Case: 1:15-cv-08178

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cvpri-01789
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2023
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 06, 2023 4:22 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
U.S. VENTURE, INC.
Represented By
Andrew Gross
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
U.S. OIL CO., INC.
Represented By
Andrew Gross
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P.
Represented By
George C. Lombardi
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/06/2023 4:21 AM EST
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/11/2023. [918888] . [CMH] [Entered: 04/25/2023 11:17 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 79 pgs Civil Case Docketed
2 2 Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 23-1739 Lead with 23-1789 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [918895] 23-1739 23-1789 [CMH] [Entered: 04/25/2023 11:33 AM]
Related: [-]