South Carolina District Court
Judge:Joseph Dawson, III
Case #: 4:23-cv-01702
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2023
Terminated:May 14, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Oct 22, 2023 6:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Nancy Poole
Defendant
Jo Jo Inc of Myrtle Beach
Plaintiff
Gabrielle Campbell
Represented By
Lauren Kay Anderson
Ralph Wilson Law, PC
contact info
Ralph James Wilson, Jr
Ralph Wilson Law, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tateyanna Jackson
Represented By
Lauren Kay Anderson
Ralph Wilson Law, PC
contact info
Ralph James Wilson, Jr
Ralph Wilson Law, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Strand College of Hair Design
Terminated: 07/28/2023


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
36 36 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order Wed 05/14 3:31 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 5/14/2025. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/14 3:29 PM
TEXT ORDER granting unopposed 34 Motion for Conditional Order of Dismissal. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 5/14/2025. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
34 34 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/21 10:15 AM
MOTION Conditional Order of Dismissal by Jo Jo Inc of Myrtle Beach, Nancy Poole, Strand College of Hair Design. Response to Motion due by 5/5/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Baroody, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
33 33 minutes Telephone Conference Thu 03/06 11:33 AM
Minute Entry. The Court held a telephonic status conference pursuant to 32 NOTICE of Telephone Conference set for 3/6/2025. The parties notified the Court of a pending resolution of the case and are no longer in need of the Court's assistance with a discovery matter. (swel, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 03/05 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Telephone Status Conference set for 3/6/2025 10:30 AM before Honorable Joseph Dawson III. The parties have circulated a conference line for the call. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
30 30 adr ADR Statement/Certification Tue 02/25 8:52 AM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S ORDER TO CONDUCT MEDIATION by Jo Jo Inc of Myrtle Beach, Nancy Poole(Lusk, Holly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Tue 01/28 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Benjamin A Baroody for 02/17/2025 through 02/21/2025 (Baroody, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
28 28 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/10 11:36 AM
THIRD AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 3/21/2025, Jury Selection and/or trial on or after 4/15/2025, Mediation Due by 2/21/2025. Signed by Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 1/10/25. (swel, )
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 01/10 11:32 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 26 Consent Motion for Amended Scheduling Order as provided in the Third Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 1/10/25.(swel, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
26 26 motion Amend/Correct Thu 01/09 12:51 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct24 Scheduling Order by Jo Jo Inc of Myrtle Beach, Strand College of Hair Design, Nancy Poole. Response to Motion due by 1/23/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Lusk, Holly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
25 25 motion Compel Thu 12/05 1:00 PM
MOTION to Compel Mediation by Jo Jo Inc of Myrtle Beach, Strand College of Hair Design, Nancy Poole. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Baroody, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - 2024-11-05 BAB EM to Anderson Re Mediation,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 - 2024-11-17 BAB EM to Anderson Follow Up re Mediation,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 3 - 2024-11-26 Ltr to Anderson re Mediation,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex 4 - 2024-12-02 - EM to Anderson re Mediation
Monday, November 04, 2024
24 24 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/04 3:40 PM
SECOND AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Motions due by 1/15/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 4/15/2025, Mediation Due by 12/15/2024. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 11/4/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 11/04 3:36 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 22 Consent Motion to Amend Scheduling Order as provided in the Second Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 11/4/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
22 22 motion Amend/Correct Tue 10/29 9:26 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct15 Scheduling Order,, by Gabrielle Campbell, Tateyanna Jackson. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Anderson, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Tue 08/13 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Benjamin A Baroody for 10/2/2024 through 10/16/2024 (Baroody, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Tue 06/18 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Cancellation of Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/18/2024 @ 1:30 PM. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 06/11 8:30 AM
NOTICE of Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/18/2024 @ 1:30 PM before Honorable Joseph Dawson III. The parties have circulated a conference line for the call. (mcot, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
18 18 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 05/17 5:19 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Gabrielle Campbell, Tateyanna Jackson.(Anderson, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
17 17 service Certificate of Service Tue 04/09 4:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jo Jo Inc of Myrtle Beach, Nancy Poole, Strand College of Hair Design (Lusk, Holly)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 04/09 4:18 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jo Jo Inc of Myrtle Beach, Nancy Poole.(Lusk, Holly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/28 10:27 AM
AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/10/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 4/10/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/1/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/30/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/30/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/30/2024, Discovery due by 10/29/2024, Motions due by 11/29/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 2/28/2025, Mediation Due by 10/29/2024. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 3/28/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/27 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Michelle Lusk on behalf of Jo Jo Inc of Myrtle Beach, Nancy Poole, Strand College of Hair Design (Lusk, Holly)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Wed 03/27 10:17 AM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Gabrielle Campbell, Tateyanna Jackson.(Anderson, Lauren)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Discovery Report Wed 03/27 10:16 AM
DISCOVERY REPORT by Tateyanna Jackson, Gabrielle Campbell.(Anderson, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/06 1:27 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/27/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/10/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 4/10/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/1/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/31/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/1/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/1/2024, Discovery due by 8/30/2024, Motions due by 9/30/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 12/30/2024, Mediation Due by 8/30/2024. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 3/6/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
10 10 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 03/05 3:26 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jo Jo Inc of Myrtle Beach, Nancy Poole.(Baroody, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/05 3:25 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint by Jo Jo Inc of Myrtle Beach, Nancy Poole, Strand College of Hair Design.(Baroody, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 01/22 2:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Jo Jo Inc of Myrtle Beach, Nancy Poole. Service due by 4/22/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/26 12:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tateyanna Jackson, Gabrielle Campbell. Service due by 1/24/2024 (Anderson, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Friday, July 28, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 07/28 4:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tateyanna Jackson, Gabrielle Campbell. Service due by 10/26/2023 (Anderson, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/26 9:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Nancy Poole, Strand College of Hair Design. Service due by 7/25/2023.(lgib, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 04/26 9:49 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gabrielle Campbell, Tateyanna Jackson. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/26 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Nancy Poole, Strand College of Hair Design (filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-11065808), filed by Tateyanna Jackson, Gabrielle Campbell. Service due by 7/24/2023. (lgib, )
Related: [-]