Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Teresa H Pearson
Case #: 3:23-bk-30913
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Aug 24, 2023
Terminated:Feb 02, 2025

Debtor
Blue Mountain Rentals, LLC
79252 WESTLAND RD
Hermiston, OR 97838
Represented By
LAURA JANE ECKSTEIN
Laura Eckstein Law, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeanne E Huffman
Jeanne E. Huffman, Trustee LLC Pob 1674
Pendleton, OR 97801
Represented By
JUSTIN D LEONARD
Leonard Law Group LLC
contact info
STEPHEN A RAHER
Leonard Law Group, LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Portland
1220 SW 3rd Ave., Rm. 315
Portland, OR 97204


Docket last updated: 08/03/2023 5:08 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
crditcrd none Wed 04/26 7:24 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Attorney Ch 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 23-30913 7] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A20828010. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 5 pgs misc Attorney Ch 7 Voluntary Petition Wed 04/26 7:24 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Fee Amount $338 (ECKSTEIN, LAURA)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 04/26 7:26 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed By Debtor Blue Mountain Rentals, LLC (ECKSTEIN, LAURA)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case and Notice of Meeting of Creditors Set for 6/12/2023 at 09:00AM at 341 Meeting via Telephone (HUFU). Dial 877-711-0954, passcode 4081510. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]