Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Kim R Gibson
Case #: 3:23-cv-00076
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2023
Terminated:Jun 09, 2023
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Middle, 1:23-cv-00653
Last checked: Monday Oct 23, 2023 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
LOANCARE, LLC
Represented By
Sarah Hillman
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Nicholas J. Godfrey
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Defendant
NATIONS LENDING CORPORATION
Represented By
Sarah Hillman
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Nicholas J. Godfrey
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RUSSELL T. HEIL
Represented By
Stephen D. Wicks
contact info


Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago
Monday, June 12, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/12 4:30 PM
ORDER approving13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by RUSSELL T. HEIL Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/12/23. (cel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
14 14 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Do NOT use for amended complaint Fri 06/09 9:02 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT Certificate of Service to Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Complaint by Russell T. Heil. re13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Wicks, Stephen) Modified text on 6/9/2023 to add document linkage. (ctb)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Fri 06/09 5:39 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Russell T. Heil (Wicks, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
12 12 misc Proposed Initial Scheduling Order Mon 06/05 3:55 PM
Proposed Initial Scheduling Order by LOANCARE, LLC, Nations Lending Corporation. (Godfrey, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 06/05 3:55 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Godfrey, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Implementing Fed. R. Evid. 502(d)
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
10 10 order Case Management Order Tue 05/02 11:00 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and 16.2, an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference shall be held TELEPHONICALLY on June 12, 2023, at 11:00 a.m, and as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 5/2/2023. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process,
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" - Fed.R.Civ. P. 26(f) Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" - Initial Scheduling Order
Friday, April 28, 2023
9 9 adr Notice of ADR Designation Fri 04/28 10:29 AM
NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/27 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Hillman on behalf of LOANCARE, LLC, Nations Lending Corporation. (Hillman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
7 7 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 04/26 8:59 PM
BRIEF in Support re6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LOANCARE, LLC, Nations Lending Corporation. (Godfrey, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/26 8:58 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LOANCARE, LLC, Nations Lending Corporation. (Godfrey, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Court
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (for Clerk of Court Personnel Only) Wed 04/26 3:58 PM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:23-cv-00653. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/26 4:02 PM
Judge Kim R. Gibson added as Presider. (bjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
4 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the WD of PA Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 4/21/23. (ma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
3 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Nations Lending Corporation. (aaa)
Related: [-]
2 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Loancare, LLC. (aaa)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nations Lending Corporation, Loancare, LLC from Blair County Court of Common Pleas, case number 23-573. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-6262997), filed by Nations Lending Corporation, Loancare, LLC.(aaa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 3 B