Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:J Campbell Barker
Case #: 6:23-cv-00204
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2023
Terminated:Apr 07, 2025
Case in other court:402nd Judicial District of Wood County, Texas, 22-00187
Last checked: Monday Oct 23, 2023 3:39 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
American Terminal Export Co., Inc.
Represented By
David Keith Isaak
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Hawk Litter Service, L.L.C.
Represented By
James Ray Rodgers
The Moore Law Firm - Paris
contact info
David Keith Isaak
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Steve Ryan Hawkins
Represented By
James Ray Rodgers
The Moore Law Firm - Paris
contact info
David Keith Isaak
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Sigma Agriscience, LLC
Represented By
David Keith Isaak
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP
contact info
Irby Ray Kerlick, Jr
Wadler, Perches, Hundl & Kerlick
contact info
Counter Claimant
Texas Sigma Partners, L.L.C
Represented By
David Keith Isaak
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
FCCI Insurance Company
Represented By
Beth D Bradley
Tollefson Bradley Mitchell & Melendi LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By
Beth D Bradley
Tollefson Bradley Mitchell & Melendi LLP
contact info
Defendant
American Terminal Export Co., Inc.
Represented By
Yevgeniy Zilberman
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka
contact info
David Keith Isaak
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP
contact info
Conor Harvey
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Hawk Litter Service, L.L.C.
Represented By
James Ray Rodgers
The Moore Law Firm - Paris
contact info
David Keith Isaak
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steve Ryan Hawkins
Represented By
James Ray Rodgers
The Moore Law Firm - Paris
contact info
David Keith Isaak
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP
contact info
Defendant
Texas Sigma Partners, L.L.C
Represented By
Yevgeniy Zilberman
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka
contact info
David Keith Isaak
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP
contact info
Conor Harvey
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
FCCI Insurance Company
Represented By
Suzanne Angelique Schlicher
Tollefson Bradley Mitchell & Melendi, LLP
contact info
Beth D Bradley
Tollefson Bradley Mitchell & Melendi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By
Beth D Bradley
Tollefson Bradley Mitchell & Melendi LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
utility Remark Mon 04/07 9:45 AM
Civil action dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a) and Doc.78 stipulation of dismissal. (ndc)
Related: [-]