Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 1:23-cv-00028
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2023
Terminated:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 23, 2023 3:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Jacob Brooks
Represented By
Kristin Ellis Berexa
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Cassandra M. Crane
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Defendant
Billy Grenko
Represented By
Robyn Beale Williams
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Defendant
Michael Schrader
Represented By
Robyn Beale Williams
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Defendant
Erik Smith
Represented By
Robyn Beale Williams
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Plaintiff
Jake Christopher Reynolds
Represented By
David J. Weissman
Raybin & Weissman, P.C.
contact info
Benjamin K. Raybin
Raybin & Weissman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 01, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Administratively Closing Case Order Staying Case Fri 03/01 4:20 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE/ORDER STAYING CASE: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff Jake Christopher Reynolds' Unopposed Motion to Stay Case. (Doc. No.22 ). The Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, this case is hereby STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending resolution of Plaintiff's criminal charges. Within 30 days of the resolution of the state criminal charges, Plaintiff shall file a notice and motion to reopen the case. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/1/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
23 23 4 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 02/29 1:31 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of22 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay filed by Jake Christopher Reynolds . (Weissman, David)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Stay Thu 02/29 1:27 PM
MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay by Jake Christopher Reynolds. (Weissman, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 08/16 2:08 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to STRIKE the May 16 notice of appearance stated in the docket entry as by Kristin Berexa (Docket No. 7 ) and is further directed to TERMINATE Kristin Berexa as counsel of record for Defendant Jacob Brooks. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/16/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference by Telephone Wed 08/16 11:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Status/Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 8/16/2023. (Hearing lasted 0:10) (MCC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
20 20 4 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Mon 08/07 4:42 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 3/25/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6D before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Exhibit List due by 3/10/2025. Witness List due by 3/10/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2025 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6D before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/10/2025. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/7/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
19 19 order Case Management Order Fri 08/04 9:40 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2023. Discovery due by 4/12/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 9/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/4/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 08/04 9:38 AM
ORDER: Because this issue was inadvertently overlooked for discussion during the initial case management conference, a telephonic status/case management conference is set for August 16, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. (CDT) using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/4/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
minutes Case Management Conference Fri 08/04 9:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/24/2023. (Hearing lasted 0:32) (KF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 07/07 9:47 AM
ORDER: This case is scheduled for an initial case management conference on July 11, 2023. See Notice at Docket No.4 . However, due to an unexpected conflict, the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED for July 24, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. (CDT) using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#, and the parties' proposed case management order (Docket No.16 ). It is SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/7/2023. (af)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
16 16 misc Proposed Case Management Order Thu 07/06 2:15 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Jacob Brooks. (Crane, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/31 9:31 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Jake Christopher Reynolds. Michael Schrader served on 5/8/2023. (Weissman, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/31 9:29 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Jake Christopher Reynolds. Jacob Brooks served on 5/8/2023. (Weissman, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/31 9:25 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Jake Christopher Reynolds. Erik Smith served on 5/8/2023. (Weissman, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/31 9:22 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Jake Christopher Reynolds. Billy Grenko served on 5/8/2023. (Weissman, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/30 7:47 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Jacob Brooks.(Crane, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 05/30 3:32 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Robyn Beale Williams admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/26 3:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Billy Grenko, Michael Schrader, Erik Smith.(Williams, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Injunction entered 04-06-2022
Thursday, May 25, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/25 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Beale Williams on behalf of Billy Grenko, Michael Schrader, Erik Smith (Williams, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 05/18 10:40 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Cassandra M. Crane admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/17 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra M. Crane on behalf of Jacob Brooks (Crane, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 05/17 10:09 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Kristin Ellis Berexa admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/16 8:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Ellis Berexa on behalf of Jacob Brooks (Berexa, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/27 1:07 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 04/27/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 04/27 9:38 AM
Summons issued as to Jacob Brooks, Billy Grenko, Michael Schrader, Erik Smith. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Thu 04/27 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/11/2023 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 04/27 9:21 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Thu 04/27 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 04/27 10:29 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for David J. Weissman, Benjamin K. Raybin admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/27 9:17 AM
COMPLAINT against Jacob Brooks, Billy Grenko, Michael Schrader, Erik Smith (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3810546), filed by Jake Christopher Reynolds.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet