North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 5:23-cv-00229
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2023
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 24, 2023 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.
1111 Newton Street
Gretna, LA 70053
Represented By
Don S McKinney
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Ashlee B. Poplin
contact info
Defendant
FastMed Urgent Care, P.C.
9060 E. Via Linda Blvd. Suite 250
Scottsdale, AZ 85258
Defendant
Heinen Medical Corporation
151 Leon Street
Eunice, LA 70535
Represented By
Mindi Lin Schulze
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Ayana M. Parker
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brian N Heinen
Represented By
Mindi Lin Schulze
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Ayana M. Parker
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pamela McCord


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, March 27, 2025
26 26 order Judgment Thu 03/27 10:04 AM
AMENDED JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff's complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case is closed. Signed by deputy clerk for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/27/2025. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment Thu 03/27 9:06 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ayana M. Parker terminated and granting19 Motion to Set Amend Judgment. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/25/2024. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Mon 03/10 10:52 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ,19 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment per FRCP 60(b)(1) . (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
24 24 notice Notice-other Tue 02/25 5:00 PM
Notice filed by Pamela McCord regarding19 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment per FRCP 60(b)(1) . (Gambale, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
23 23 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 10/23 9:17 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Heinen Medical Corporation, Brian N Heinen. (Parker, Ayana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/26 3:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding19 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment per FRCP 60(b)(1) filed by Brian N Heinen, Heinen Medical Corporation. (Schulze, Mindi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/25 1:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding19 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment per FRCP 60(b)(1) filed by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. (Poplin, Ashlee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
20 20 8 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 09/05 11:33 AM
Memorandum in Support regarding19 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment per FRCP 60(b)(1) filed by Pamela McCord. (Gambale, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Pamela McCord
19 19 motion Set Aside Judgment Thu 09/05 11:31 AM
MOTION to Set Aside Judgment per FRCP 60(b)(1) filed by Pamela McCord. (Gambale, Matthew)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/05 11:03 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Ryan Gambale on behalf of Pamela McCord. (Gambale, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/05 11:02 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Seth D. Beckley on behalf of Pamela McCord. (Beckley, Seth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
16 16 order Judgment Tue 04/30 4:31 PM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff's complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This case is closed. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/30/2024. Copy sent via US Mail to Sent to Desmon L. Andrade at Law Office of Desmon L. Andreade, PLLC 230 Donaldson Street, 300B Fayetteville, NC 28301. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/30 4:19 PM
Order - As plaintiff has failed to prosecute this action or demonstrate good cause for her failure to do so, plaintiff's complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/29/2024. Copy sent via US Mail to Sent to Desmon L. Andrade at Law Office of Desmon L. Andreade, PLLC 230 Donaldson Street, 300B Fayetteville, NC 28301. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/01 11:42 AM
ORDER - This cause comes before the Court sua sponte on plaintiff's failure to appear in this case. This case was removed from Wake County Superior Court on April 27, 2023. Plaintiff's counsel was sent multiple notices from the Clerk's Office to file a notice of appearance in the case [DE 3, DE 11, DE 13]. Plaintiff's counsel nor plaintiff has appeared in the case. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to show cause by February 12, 2024 as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Failure to show cause shall result in the dismissal of the case. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/1/2024. Sent to Desmon L. Andrade at Law Office of Desmon L. Andreade, PLLC 230 Donaldson Street, 300B Fayetteville, NC 28301 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
13 13 notice Notice-other Thu 08/24 8:47 AM
THIRD Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Desmon L. Andrade of Law Office of Desmon L. Andreade, PLLC at 230 Donaldson Street, 300B, Fayetteville, NC 28301. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 08/22 11:47 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Don S McKinney on behalf of Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. (McKinney, Don)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 08/21 4:35 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:6 Notice of Special Appearance. All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out of district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
11 11 notice Notice-other Mon 06/05 12:16 PM
Second Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Desmon L. Andrade of Law Office of Desmon L. Andreade, PLLC at 230 Donaldson Street, 300B, Fayetteville, NC 28301. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
10 10 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 05/11 11:04 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Brian N Heinen, Heinen Medical Corporation (Parker, Ayana)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/11 11:02 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ayana M. Parker on behalf of Brian N Heinen, Heinen Medical Corporation. (Parker, Ayana)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/11 10:59 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Mindi Lin Schulze on behalf of Brian N Heinen, Heinen Medical Corporation. (Schulze, Mindi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 05/04 11:17 AM
Alere Toxicology Services, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. (Poplin, Ashlee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Special Appearance Wed 05/03 1:14 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Ashlee B. Poplin on behalf of Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. (Poplin, Ashlee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 05/02 12:16 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Laboratory Specialist of America, Corporate Parent Alere US Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Alere, Inc., Corporate Parent Abbott Laboratories for Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. (Poplin, Ashlee)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/02 8:55 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ashlee B. Poplin on behalf of Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. (Poplin, Ashlee)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Correction Tue 05/02 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: Notice to Counsel regarding attorney address information - Counsel had updated her address information but there was a hangup on the PACER end. Everything has been fixed now and is updated. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
3 3 notice Notice-other Mon 05/01 3:06 PM
Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Desmon L. Andrade of Law Office of Desmon L. Andreade, PLLC at 230 Donaldson Street, 300B, Fayetteville, NC 28301 and to Counsel for Defendants, Heinen Medical Corporation and Brian N. Heinen, Mindi L. Schulze & Ayana M. Parker of Gordon Reese Scully Mansukhani, LLP at 421 Fayetteville Street, Suite 330, Raleigh, NC 27601 mailed via US Mail on May 1, 2023. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice-other Mon 05/01 2:59 PM
Notice filed by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc. regarding1 Notice of Removal, . (Poplin, Ashlee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 05/01 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Notice of Removal - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 05/01 2:56 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure Mon 05/01 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Alere Toxicology Services, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 05/01 2:58 PM
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 05/01 3:00 PM
Notice to Counsel - The address information in the signature block for Ashlee B. Poplin on the complaint does not match the information that the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel should email the updated law firm information to the clerk's office at NCED-AttomeyUpdate@nced.uscourts.gov. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/27 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc. Notice of Removal from Superior Court of Wake County, case number 2023CVS001279. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7059602), filed by Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. (Poplin, Ashlee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1