Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen C Dries
Case #: 2:23-cv-00532
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2023
Terminated:Jun 12, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 24, 2023 4:14 AM CDT
Defendant
Babes LLC
Plaintiff
Rovin Inc
Represented By
Richard L Schwartz
Whitaker Chalk Swindle & Schwartz PLLC
contact info
Daniel A Manna
Gass Turek LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
6 6 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Tue 06/13 9:28 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (kah)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/12 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rovin Inc.(Manna, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
utility Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys Tue 06/13 9:23 AM
Case Terminated per5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (kah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Thu 05/11 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re4 Admission of Service filed by Rovin Inc ; The incorrect event was chosen. Summons Returned Executed is the proper event. The docket entry has been corrected and there is nothing to refile.; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
4 4 service Admission of Service Wed 05/10 10:44 AM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint on April 30, 2023 by Zani Islami, Manager for Babes, LLC (Manna, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Fri 04/28 1:20 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (kah)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 04/28 11:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Babes LLC. (kah)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Modification Fri 04/28 11:34 AM
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. ; Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] , the[LINK:summons instructions] and the[LINK:party name guidelines found in the user manual] for further guidance (kah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 04/27 11:32 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Rovin Inc. (Manna, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/27 11:30 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Babes LLC by Rovin Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4387882)(Manna, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Selected Pages from Rovins Babes Chicken Website),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Rovins Federal Service Mark Registrations),
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (Examples of Rovins Babes Signage),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (Rovins Babes Marketing & Promotional Materials),
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 (Examples of Rovins Parade Participation Using Babes Marks),
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 (National Magazine Articles Featuring Rovin Family of Babes Marks),
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 (Examples of Defendants Infringing Activity),
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 (Article about Defendants Restaurant Openings),
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 Summons
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 04/27 11:47 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] (jcl)
Related: [-]