Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joel H Slomsky
Case #: 2:23-cv-01608
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2023
Terminated:Mar 13, 2024
Case in other court:Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, 03-03329
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 24, 2023 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
UNITRIN SAFEGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY
12926 GRAN BAY PARKWAY WEST
JACKSONVILLE, FL 32258
Represented By
ROBERT S. STICKLEY
Stickley Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DIMITRIOS GEORGIS
Represented By
GEORGE A. MARINELLI
Aivazoglou & Mikropoulos
contact info
Plaintiff
NIKOLAOS GEORGIS
Represented By
GEORGE A. MARINELLI
Aivazoglou & Mikropoulos
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 03/13 2:47 PM
ORDER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(B). THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THE CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/13/24. 3/13/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/04 4:42 PM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL UPDATE THE COURT BY DECEMBER 18, 2023 ON THE STATUS OF THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE. THE PARTIES MAY RESPOND TO THIS ORDER BY FILING A LETTER OF RECORD. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 12/4/23. 12/4/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
9 9 notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Wed 08/30 5:57 PM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - Arbitration, scheduled for 09/14/2023(sah)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Wed 08/30 4:57 PM
Letter dated 8 30-2023 by DIMITRIOS GEORGIS, NIKOLAOS GEORGIS. (MARINELLI, GEORGE)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Arbitration Fri 08/25 2:04 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO ARBITRATION. THE FOLLOWING CERTIFIED ARBITRATORS HAVE BEEN RANDOMLY SELECTED TO HEAR THIS CASE: CHAIRPERSON: THOMAS GALLAGHER, ESQ.; ARBITRATOR: ANDREW M. OMINSKY, ESQ.; ARBITRATOR: RICHARD J. SEXTON, ESQ. THE ARBITRATION HEARING WILL BE HELD ON 9/14/23, AT 9:30 AM, IN COURTROOM 5D, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/25/23. 8/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 07/05 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 9/14/2023 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 5D. (aes)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
5 5 adr Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference Mon 05/15 5:45 PM
Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference (aes)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/09 6:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by UNITRIN SAFEGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY.(STICKLEY, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
3 3 misc State Court Record Fri 05/05 10:44 AM
Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (afm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
2 2 adr Letter re: Arbitration Certification Fri 04/28 9:51 AM
Letter re: Arbitration Certification(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Arbitration Certification Form
Thursday, April 27, 2023
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Thu 04/27 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITRIN SAFEGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16656155), filed by UNITRIN SAFEGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY.(STICKLEY, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form Designation Form,
Att: 4 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form