New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Allyne R Ross
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:12-cv-06300
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2012
Terminated:Jul 14, 2014
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 11, 2015 10:28 PM EDT
Defendant
The City College Of New York
Represented By
Christopher Vance Coulston
Office Of The New York State Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
The City University of New York
Represented By
Christopher Vance Coulston
Office Of The New York State Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Karif Patterson
Represented By
Stewart Lee Karlin
The Law Offices Of Stewart Lee Karlin, P.C.
contact info

GPO Mar 21 2014
ORDER denying 25 Motion for Discovery: For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, plaintiff's motion to re-open discovery or for additional discovery pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) is denied. As previously directed, defendants shall file the fully briefed motion for summary judgment by April 2, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/21/2014. (Nair, Rekha)
GPO Jul 14 2014
OPINION AND ORDER granting 34 defendant's motion for summary judgment and denying 31 plaintiff's appeal of the 29 March 21, 2014 discovery order. For the reasons set forth in the attached opinion, the court grants defendant's motion for summary judgment, denies plaintiff's appeal of the discovery order, and dismisses the action in its entirety. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 7/14/2014. (Rubin-Wills, Jessica)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.