Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Greg Gerard Guidry
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:23-cv-01431
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2023
Terminated:Jan 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 25, 2023 9:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By
James L. Donovan, Jr.
Donovan & Lawler
contact info
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Craig Thibodaux
Represented By
Tristan Gregory Gruspier
Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Matthew M. Mize
Robichaux, Mize, Wadsack & Richardson, LLC
contact info
Rajan Pandit
Pandit Law Firm, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info
John Edward Carr, III
Pandit Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Leslie Thibodaux
Represented By
Tristan Gregory Gruspier
Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Matthew M. Mize
Robichaux, Mize, Wadsack & Richardson, LLC
contact info
Rajan Pandit
Pandit Law Firm, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info
John Edward Carr, III
Pandit Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
17 17 21 pgs order Order Tue 01/07 2:33 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Tue 01/30 4:37 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 1/30/2024. (lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 01/29 2:24 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss by Allstate Indemnity Company.(Donovan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
14 14 30+ pgs order Order Wed 12/13 4:28 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
13 13 misc ADI event Thu 10/05 12:34 PM
Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
12 12 30+ pgs order Order Wed 09/27 1:09 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
11 11 30+ pgs order Order Fri 09/15 10:24 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
10 10 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 05/23 10:45 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allstate Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Indemnity Company (Donovan, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/23 10:43 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Allstate Indemnity Company.(Donovan, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 05/23 8:54 AM
FILED IN ERROR: SEE R. DOC10 : Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allstate Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Indemnity Company (Donovan, James) Modified on 5/23/2023 (js)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/23 8:52 AM
FILED IN ERROR: SEE R. DOC9 : ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Indemnity Company.Attorney James L. Donovan, Jr added to party Allstate Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Donovan, James) Modified on 5/23/2023 (js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/03 8:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Allstate Indemnity Company served on 5/2/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. (Carr, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 05/01 2:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Allstate Indemnity Company. (js)
Related: [-]
4 4 27 pgs order Order Mon 05/01 2:50 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(js)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Transferring Case Mon 05/01 12:14 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 05/01/2023.(js)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Fri 04/28 3:30 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/28 3:19 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Allstate Indemnity Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9914614) filed by Leslie Thibodaux, Craig Thibodaux.Attorney John Edward Carr, III added to party Craig Thibodaux(pty:pla), Attorney John Edward Carr, III added to party Leslie Thibodaux(pty:pla).(Carr, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons