Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Referred: Walter E Johnson
Case #: 1:23-cv-01919
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2023
Terminated:Jul 03, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 24, 2023 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Veho Tech, Inc.
Represented By
Jacqueline Elise Kalk
Littler Mendelson, Pc-Mn
contact info
Pierre-Joseph Noebes
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristy Forrester
Represented By
Ianna O. Richardson
Barrett & Farahany
contact info


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Monday, July 03, 2023
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 07/03 4:57 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING4 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (dnb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 07/03 5:00 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
4 4 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 06/30 1:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Veho Tech, Inc.. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/04 2:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kristy Forrester. Veho Tech, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/28/2023, answer due 6/27/2023. (Richardson, Ianna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 04/28 8:53 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Veho Tech, Inc. (tht)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/28 8:51 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kristy Forrester. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12562088)(tht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet