GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC v. CONNIE LILES AUTO PARTS INC et al.,
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Allen C Winsor |
Referred: | Martin A Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-00169 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 25, 2023 10:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
CONNIE LILES
2332 Cypress Cove Drive
Tallahassee, FL 32310 |
|
Defendant
CONNIE LILES AUTO PARTS INC
|
|
Plaintiff
GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC
4200 Six Forks Road
Raleigh, VA 27609 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Terminated: 05/25/2023
2999 Wildwood Parkway
Atlanta, GA 30339 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/26 8:26 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL re 14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC. This order confirms the claims against Genuine Parts Company are dismissed. The case will proceed against the remaining defendants. Future filings should omit Genuine Parts Company from the case style. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 5/25/2023. (atm) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 05/25 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC (THOMPSON, TREVOR) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/16 7:57 AM
ORDER REGARDING STATUS REPORT AND DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION. The motion (ECF No. 2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 5/15/2023. (atm) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Fri 05/05 6:27 PM
STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Order (ECF No. 9) by GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC. (THOMPSON, TREVOR) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/05 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHON ANDREW FLIGG on behalf of GENUINE PARTS COMPANY (FLIGG, JONATHON) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/01 10:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH JOY CAMPBELL on behalf of GENUINE PARTS COMPANY (CAMPBELL, ELIZABETH) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 9:37 AM
ORDER DENYING 2 TRO signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 5/1/23. To the extent the motion seeks preliminary injunctive relief, the motion remains pending. No later than Friday, 5/5/2023 , the parties must file a joint status report. (tss) |
|
8 | 8
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 05/01 9:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR:Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2023 re2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC - hearing held - written order to follow (Court Reporter Lisa Snyder (USDC-Tallahassee)) (tss) |
|
Sunday, April 30, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
respoth
Response/Reply
Sun 04/30 5:34 PM
RESPONSE by GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC re5 Order,, Providing Certification of Service and Status Report by GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC. (THOMPSON, TREVOR) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Sun 04/30 3:56 PM
ORDER SETTING HEARING on 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Expedited Briefing and Discovery Schedule signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 4/30/23. The court will hold a telephonic hearing on the motion tomorrow (Monday) at 10:00 a.m. The clerk will distribute call-in information. Plaintiff must immediately serve a copy of this order and the call-in information on the Defendants, and Plaintiff must immediately file a notice (i) confirming that it has done so and (ii) providing a status report regarding whether there has been any response to its demand letters or any other post-filing developments. (tss) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Sun 04/30 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Expedited Briefing and Discovery Schedule Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2023 at 10:00 AM before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 877 873 8018 When prompted for an access code, enter: 6109198# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 7020# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel try NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audioconnection is compromised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/TiAnn Stark Courtroom Deputy Clerk (tss) |
||
Saturday, April 29, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Sat 04/29 1:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC identifying Corporate Parent ADVANCE AUTO PARTS INC for GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC.. (THOMPSON, TREVOR) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit
Sat 04/29 12:05 PM
AFFIDAVIT re2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Expedited Briefing and Discovery Schedule Exhibit 3 to Motion by GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC. (THOMPSON, TREVOR) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Sanjay Patel Aff. | ||
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Fri 04/28 10:38 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Expedited Briefing and Discovery Schedule by GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC. (THOMPSON, TREVOR) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Blanton Aff., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Sunbiz Composite | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/28 8:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7845588.), filed by GENERAL PARTS DISTRIBUTION LLC. (THOMPSON, TREVOR) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 |