Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Case #: 3:23-cv-00922
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:May 01, 2023
Terminated:Aug 08, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 28, 2023 5:55 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Sarah Chon
Represented By
John M Frick
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
William E Reid
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
ScribeNest LLC
Represented By
John M Frick
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
William E Reid
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Elliot Trotter
Represented By
John M Frick
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
William E Reid
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Lisa Williford
Represented By
John M Frick
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
William E Reid
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
HealthChannels LLC
Represented By
Nandini Kavuri Sane
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Aaron Holt
Cozen O'Connor PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
ScribeAmerica LLC
Represented By
Nandini Kavuri Sane
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Aaron Holt
Cozen O'Connor PC
contact info
Defendant
Sarah Chon
Represented By
John M Frick
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
William E Reid
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
Defendant
ScribeNest LLC
Represented By
John M Frick
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
William E Reid
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
Defendant
Elliot Trotter
Represented By
John M Frick
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
William E Reid
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
Defendant
Lisa Williford
Represented By
John M Frick
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
William E Reid
Reid & Dennis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
HealthChannels LLC
Represented By
Nandini Kavuri Sane
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Aaron Holt
Cozen O'Connor PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ScribeAmerica LLC
Represented By
Nandini Kavuri Sane
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Aaron Holt
Cozen O'Connor PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
36 36 2 pgs misc Stipulation Tue 08/08 9:07 AM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice by HealthChannels LLC, ScribeAmerica LLC. (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Tue 08/08 9:43 AM
Civil Case Terminated per36 Stipulation of Dismissal. (sxf)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
35 35 9 pgs answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 06/23 9:32 AM
ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by HealthChannels LLC, ScribeAmerica LLC. Related document:27 Counterclaim, (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
34 34 order Order Mon 06/05 11:25 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court ORDERS the Parties in this proceeding to take notice that Judge Ada Brown shall adopt revised policies and procedures on July 1, 2023. The revised policies and procedures are posted on the Courts page on the Northern District of Texas Website.[LINK:RevisedJSR-Brown.pdf (uscourts.gov)] . If the Parties have any motion or response deadlines between now and July 1, 2023, which are affected by new briefing requirements, the Parties may proceed under the current policies and procedures. The Parties may further seek leave of Court for any filings due in July 2023 to comply with the Courts revised briefing requirements. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/5/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Mon 06/05 7:09 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting32 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Having considered Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Counterclaim, the Court GRANTS the Motion, and Orders that Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Counterclaim is now June 23, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/5/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/02 9:55 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to27 Counterclaim, filed by HealthChannels LLC (Sane, Nandini)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 19, 2023
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Fri 05/19 4:57 PM
ORDER re:26 Joint Motion to Seal, or in the Alternative Motion to Unfile, Documents Defendants Mistakenly Filed Not Under Seal in Error. The Court GRANTS the Motion with respect to the Parties' alternative request to unfile the Unsealed Document. The Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to unfile Doc. 18-2, pgs. 33-36, Declaration of Sarah Chon, Exhibit F. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/19/2023) (axm)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 05/19 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nandini Kavuri Sane on behalf of HealthChannels LLC, ScribeAmerica LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sane, Nandini)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/19 12:15 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting25 Motion (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/19/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
28 28 3 pgs misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 05/19 11:04 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sarah Chon, ScribeNest LLC, Elliot Trotter, Lisa Williford. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Frick, John)
Related: [-]
27 27 58 pgs cmp Counterclaim Fri 05/19 10:44 AM
COUNTERCLAIM and Original Answer to Amended Complaint [Doc 14] against All Plaintiffs filed by Elliot Trotter, Sarah Chon, ScribeNest LLC, Lisa Williford (Frick, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
26 26 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/17 3:39 PM
MOTION to Seal Documents Defendants Mistakenly Filed Not Under Seal in Error filed by HealthChannels LLC, ScribeAmerica LLC (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/17 2:58 PM
MOTION for Formal Approval of Posting of Bond for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction re24 Order on Motion for TRO,, filed by HealthChannels LLC, ScribeAmerica LLC (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
24 24 5 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Tue 05/16 4:24 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Unless otherwise ordered by this Court, this preliminary injunction shall remain in full force and effect during the duration of this civil action, and thereafter if it is incorporated into any final judgment or agreement of the Parties. This preliminary injunction shall not take effect until Plaintiffs post with the Clerk of Court a cash sum of $500 or a bond with the amount of $500 in the form and with the surety approved by the Clerk of Court. Plaintiffs shall post such bond with the Clerk of Court no later than Thursday, May 18, 2023, at 5:00 pm. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/16/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 05/16 11:39 AM
Joint MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Agreed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction) filed by HealthChannels LLC, ScribeAmerica LLC (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 12, 2023
22 22 respm Response/Objection Fri 05/12 2:03 PM
RESPONSE filed by Sarah Chon, ScribeNest LLC, Elliot Trotter, Lisa Williford re:19 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion Related [+]
Related: [-] id, William
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
21 21 4 pgs order Order Fri 05/12 11:48 AM
ORDER: STANDING ORDER ON THE FILING OF MATERIAL UNDER SEAL (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/12/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion Fri 05/12 11:47 AM
ORDER denying sealed and/or ex parte motion17 . Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Defendant's Opposition to Application for Temporary Restraining Order, (Doc. 17), is denied without prejudice to refiling. Defendants may file an amended motion to seal but must do so in accordance with the Court's Standing Order on Filing Materials Under Seal. (Doc. 18). Any amended motion to file under seal shall be filed no later than May 15, 2023 at 5:00 pm. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/12/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
19 19 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Thu 05/11 8:04 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by HealthChannels LLC, ScribeAmerica LLC re14 Amended Complaint,, and APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
18 18 31 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 05/11 4:44 PM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint,, filed by Sarah Chon, ScribeNest LLC, Elliot Trotter, Lisa Williford. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, William
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 7
17 17 motion Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion Thu 05/11 4:31 PM
(Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Defs' Opposition to Application for TRO (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Sarah Chon, ScribeNest LLC, Elliot Trotter, Lisa Williford (Frick, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exh. E to Def. Exhibit 2,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exh. G to Def. Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exh. H to Def. Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exh. J to Def. Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exh. K to Def. Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit L to Def. Exh. 2,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exh. C to Def. Exhibit 4,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exh. D to Def. Exhibit 4
Friday, May 05, 2023
16 16 order Order Fri 05/05 3:41 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Responses due by 5/11/2023. re:14 Amended Complaint. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Jury Demand and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction. (Doc. 14). Defendants have been served, (Docs. 9, 10, 11, 13), and Defense counsel has filed its Notice of Appearance, (Doc. 12). Defendants are hereby ORDERED to file an expedited response brief responding to Plaintiff's application for TRO no later than Thursday, May 11, 2023, at 5:00 pm. Defendants' response shall be no longer than 25 pages (exclusive of cover page, table of content, and table of authorities), with one-inch margins, using 12-point times new roman font. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/5/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/05 2:42 PM
***PLEASE DISREGARD AS DUPLICATE ENTRY*** AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by ScribeAmerica LLC, HealthChannels LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Holt, Aaron) Modified docket text on 5/5/2023 (oyh)
Related: [-]
14 14 44 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/05 2:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND and Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunction against All Defendants filed by ScribeAmerica LLC, HealthChannels LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Fri 05/05 9:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Elliot Trotter ; served on 5/4/2023. (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 05/04 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Frick for William E. Reid on behalf of Sarah Chon, ScribeNest LLC, Elliot Trotter, Lisa Williford. (Frick, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Thu 05/04 8:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lisa Williford ; served on 5/3/2023. (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
10 10 service Summons Returned Wed 05/03 10:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to ScribeNest LLC ; served on 5/2/2023. (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Wed 05/03 10:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sarah Chon ; served on 5/2/2023. (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 05/01 4:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Sarah Chon, ScribeNest LLC, Elliot Trotter, Lisa Williford. (agc)
Related: [-]
7 7 qcref Brown Mon 05/01 4:19 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 05/01 3:06 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - Williford filed by HealthChannels, LLC, ScribeAmerica, LLC. (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 05/01 3:05 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - Trotter filed by HealthChannels, LLC, ScribeAmerica, LLC. (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 05/01 3:04 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - ScribeNest LLC filed by HealthChannels, LLC, ScribeAmerica, LLC. (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 05/01 3:03 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action - Chon filed by HealthChannels, LLC, ScribeAmerica, LLC. (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 05/01 2:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HealthChannels, LLC, ScribeAmerica, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/01 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by ScribeAmerica, LLC, HealthChannels, LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13705177) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Holt, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit(s) A - Agreement,
Att: 2 1 pgs Cover Sheet