Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Aida M Delgado-Colon
Case #: 3:23-cv-01210
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:May 01, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 28, 2023 6:49 AM AST
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Doe
Defendant
David H. Solis-Lopez
Represented By
Ramon L. Martinez-Vega
De Corral & De Mier, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rafael Rodriguez-Sepulveda
Represented By
Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil
Gonzalez Villamil Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Fernando Miralles-Alonso
Represented By
Miguel A. De Ayala-Hillman
Edge Legal LLC
contact info
Defendant
GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C.
Represented By
Jose E. O'Neill-Font
contact info
Jorge J. Lopez-Lopez
Lopez & Nevares LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Richard Roe
Defendant
Professional Partnership Y
Defendant
Professional Partnership X
Defendant
Insurance Company B
Defendant
Insurance Company A
Defendant
Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo, inc.
Represented By
Gilberto C. Ramos-Martinez
Jpl Law Firm LLC
contact info
Juan Antonio Pedrero-Lozada
Jpl Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Richard Doe
Defendant
Dr. John Doe
Defendant
Corporation Y
Defendant
Corporation X
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Solis-Doe
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Miralles-Doe
Plaintiff
Andres Alberto Vargas-Quinones
Represented By
Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon
Rafael E. Garcia Rodon Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
36 36 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/30 5:02 PM
ORDER. The motion to strike at ECF No. 21 is Denied. The motions for extension of time at ECF Nos. 23, 25, 34 are MOOT. The motion for leave to file motion in excess of this Courts page-limit rule at ECF No. 32 is GRANTED. However, subsequent filings shall comply with Local Civil Rule 7's page limits. The motion for extension of time to file certified translations at ECF No. 33 is MOOT. The motion for additional discovery at ECF No. 28 is MOOT in light of ECF No. 30. Plaintiff shall inform on or before 5/5/2025 the Court if GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. complied with its discovery/disclosure obligations and if plaintiff needs additional discovery in this summary judgment record. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/30/2025.(wm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
35 35 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/15 6:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. Re:30 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Andres Alberto Vargas-Quinones filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C.. (Corral-Gonzalez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
34 34 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/08 8:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2025 to File Response/Reply filed by Diego Corral-Gonzalez on behalf of GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C.. Responses due by 4/22/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corral-Gonzalez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
33 33 motion Leave to File Spanish language documents Mon 03/31 3:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents Re: Doc 30 filed by Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/14/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Rodon, Rafael)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion File Excess Pages Mon 03/31 3:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Doc. 30 filed by Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon on behalf of Andres Alberto Vargas-Quinones. Responses due by 4/14/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Rodon, Rafael)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Statement Mon 03/31 3:19 PM
Counter STATEMENT to GRHs Statement of Uncontested Facts filed by Andres Alberto Vargas-Quinones re:20 Statement, filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C.. (Garcia-Rodon, Rafael)
Related: [-]
30 30 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Mon 03/31 3:15 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to GRH's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs Re:19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Garcia-Rodon, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10
29 29 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/31 2:42 PM
**FILED IN ERROR - Per filer's request. Incomplete filing.*** RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re:19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia-Rodon, Rafael) Modified to file in error on 3/31/2025 (idg)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Docket Text Modification Mon 03/31 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re:29 Response to Motion. **FILED IN ERROR - Per filer's request. Incomplete filing.*** (idg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
28 28 motion Informative Motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 03/04 12:29 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding necessary discovery, MOTION for Extension of Time until necessary discovery is finalized to file opposition to summary judgment filed by Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/18/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Rodon, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
27 27 respm Reply to Motion Mon 01/13 3:12 PM
REPLY to Motion for Sanctions filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. Re:26 MOTION for Sanctions as to GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. filed by Andres Alberto Vargas-Quinones filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C.. (Lopez-Lopez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
26 26 motion Sanctions Mon 12/30 1:00 PM
MOTION for Sanctions as to GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. filed by Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/13/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Garcia-Rodon, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Friday, December 06, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/06 1:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply pursuant to Rule 56(d) FRCP as to19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. filed by Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/20/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Garcia-Rodon, Rafael)
Related: [-] 19
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
24 24 respm Response to Motion Wed 11/27 10:41 AM
RESPONSE to Motion to Strike filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. Re:21 MOTION to Strike Docs 20-1 & 20-2 Re:20 Statement, filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. filed by Andres Alberto Vargas-Quinones filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C..(Corral-Gonzalez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Translated Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Translated Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Unsworn Statement
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/13 1:26 PM
MOTION for extension of time until November 27, 2024 to oppose motion to strike filed by Diego Corral-Gonzalez on behalf of GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C.. Responses due by 11/27/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corral-Gonzalez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
22 22 motion Appear Fri 11/01 1:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Diego Corral-Gonzalez on behalf of GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C.. Responses due by 11/15/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Corral-Gonzalez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
21 21 motion Strike Wed 10/30 7:40 PM
MOTION to Strike Docs 20-1 & 20-2 Re:20 Statement, filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. filed by Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/13/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Garcia-Rodon, Rafael)
Related: [-] 20
Friday, October 18, 2024
20 20 misc Statement Fri 10/18 3:04 PM
STATEMENT OF UNCONTESTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT filed by GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C.. (Lopez-Lopez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Fri 10/18 2:54 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jorge J. Lopez-Lopez on behalf of GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C.. Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 11/1/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Lopez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
18 18 misc Initial Scheduling Conference Memorandum Thu 08/15 2:39 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia-Rodon, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/15 4:39 PM
ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to hold a conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and submit a Joint Proposed Initial Scheduling Memorandum, which must include the parties' factual and legal background and theories of the case. In addition, the parties are to state in the Joint Proposed Initial Scheduling Memorandum whether they consent to the trial jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The parties are granted 30 days to comply. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/14/2024. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/15/2024.(wm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/08 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Antonio Pedrero-Lozada on behalf of Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo, inc. (Pedrero-Lozada, Juan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 08/07 3:34 PM
ORDER - MOOT5 ,11 and12 Motions for extension of time. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/7/2023. (su)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/02 11:27 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil on behalf of Defendant Rafael Rodriguez-Sepulveda.(Gonzalez-Villamil, Jose)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/24 1:50 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Miguel A. De Ayala-Hillman on behalf of Defendant Fernando Miralles-Alonso.(De Ayala-Hillman, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 07/13 6:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/12/23 to File Answer re:1 Complaint,, filed by Andres Alberto Vargas-Quinones filed by Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil on behalf of Rafael Rodriguez-Sepulveda Responses due by 7/27/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Gonzalez-Villamil, Jose)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
11 11 motion Appear Wed 06/28 1:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear and Requesting Extension of Time to Plead filed by Miguel A. De Ayala-Hillman on behalf of Fernando Miralles-Alonso Responses due by 7/12/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (De Ayala-Hillman, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/22 1:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Gilberto C. Ramos-Martinez on behalf of Defendant Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo, inc..(Ramos-Martinez, Gilberto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/20 6:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Ramon L. Martinez-Vega on behalf of Defendant David H. Solis-Lopez.(Martinez-Vega, Ramon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/08 10:51 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Jose E. O'Neill-Font on behalf of Defendant GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C..(O'Neill-Font, Jose)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/07 10:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge J. Lopez-Lopez on behalf of GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. (Lopez-Lopez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
6 6 motion Appear Tue 06/06 4:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Ramon L. Martinez-Vega on behalf of David H. Solis-Lopez Responses due by 6/20/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Vega, Ramon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time Thu 06/01 11:26 AM
MOTION for extension of time until July 1, 2023 to answer complaint or otherwise plead filed by Jose E. O'Neill-Font on behalf of GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C. Responses due by 6/15/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (O'Neill-Font, Jose)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
4 4 misc Transcript USCA Tue 05/23 6:08 PM
***FILED IN ERROR*** Transcript of Jury Trial (DAY-1) held on 2 8-2023 before Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joe Reynosa. COA Number: 23-1210 NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov. . Redaction Request due 6/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2023. (be) Modified on 5/23/2023 (be)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 05/02 9:39 AM
Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Miralles-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Solis-Doe, GRH Anesthesia Group, P.S.C., Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo, inc., Fernando Miralles-Alonso, Rafael Rodriguez-Sepulveda, David H. Solis-Lopez. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (arg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 05/02 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (arg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/01 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8196867.), filed by Andres Alberto Vargas Quinones. Service due by 7/31/2023,(Garcia-Rodon, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Sheet Category Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons HEAM,
Att: 4 Summons Dr. David Solis,
Att: 5 Summons Dr. Rafael Rodriguez,
Att: 6 Summons Dr. Miralles,
Att: 7 Summons Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Doe,
Att: 8 Summons Conjugal Partnership Miralles-Doe,
Att: 9 Summons Conjugal Partnership Solis-Doe,
Att: 10 Summons GRH Anesthesia