RESPES v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy Beetlestone |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-05819 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2014 |
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 6:50 PM EDT |
Defendant
COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JONINA RESPES
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
![]() ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 6/1/2015. 6/2/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 20, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET Settlement Conference held on 5/18/2015. (sg, ) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
![]() SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/4/2015 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. DISCOVERY DUE BY 6/11/2015. DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 7/9/2015. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 8/21/2015. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 7/9/2015. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/10/2015. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/14/2015. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 9/8/2015 09:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/8/2015. 5/8/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ERIN GREWE on behalf of JONINA RESPES(GREWE, ERIN) |
|
Tuesday, April 28, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Hearing: A settlement conference will be held on May 18, 2015 at 2:30 p.m., before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 6, Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building, 900 Market Street, Philadelphia, PA 19107. Please notify the court if settlement is not a real possibility. The conference will not be held unless counsel has clients with full and complete settlement authority physically present for the duration of the conference. Full and complete authority means the party's representative must possess authority consistent with the most recent demand. If the defendant does not intend to make a settlement offer, or intends to offer nuisance value only, defendant should arrange a telephone conference with chambers and parties. Please complete the attached summary and e-mail to sheila_mccurry@paed.uscourts.gov on or before May 11, 2015. (smcc) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/2/2015. 4/3/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
![]() AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, A STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/24/2015 09:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE., DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/11/2015., DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 6/9/2015., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 6/9/2015.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/24/2015. 3/24/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
![]() First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by JONINA RESPES.Certificate of Service.(GREWE, ERIN) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, February 11, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY TO HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/11/2015. 2/11/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) |
|
Monday, January 05, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ANSWER to Complaint by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS.(HOLMES, TIMOTHY) |
|
Wednesday, December 24, 2014 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME, NUNC PRO TUNC TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT OR TO FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO OR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT MUST BE FILED BY JANUARY 6, 2015.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 12/24/14.12/14/14 ENTERED AND COPIES, E-MAILED (ldb, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 23, 2014 | ||
16 | 16
![]() BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENLARGEMEN OF TIME filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. Certificate of Service.(HOLMES, TIMOTHY) Modified on 12/29/2014 (afm, ). |
|
15 | 15
![]() PROPOSED ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME14 filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS.Proposed Order.(HOLMES, TIMOTHY) Modified on 12/29/2014 (afm, ). |
|
14 | 14
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS.Certificate of Service.(HOLMES, TIMOTHY) |
|
Tuesday, December 16, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY Pretrial Conference held on 11/25/2014. (sg, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 10, 2014 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY Pretrial Conference held on 11/24/2014. (sg, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 02, 2014 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CARA BUSHMAN GREENHALL on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS(GREENHALL, CARA) |
|
Monday, December 01, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY A. HOLMES on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS with Jury Demand/Certificate of Service(HOLMES, TIMOTHY) |
|
9 | 9
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/25/2015. PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REPORTS DUE 2/25/15; DEFENDANT'S REPORTS DUE 3/11/15; DEPOSITIONS OF ALL EXPERTS MUST BE COMPLETED BY 3/25/15. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 4/9/2015.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 12/1/14. 12/1/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (ldb, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 25, 2014 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Thursday, November 20, 2014 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Tuesday, November 18, 2014 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Monday, November 17, 2014 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Friday, November 14, 2014 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Tuesday, October 28, 2014 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Friday, October 17, 2014 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Tuesday, October 14, 2014 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Summons Issued as to COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/15/14 (ks, ) | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JONINA RESPES. (ks, ) |