Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:23-bk-70113

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 7:23-ap-07002
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:May 01, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, as successor to (See ECF No. [1] for names of entities)
999 17th Street, Suite 700
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Blackjewel Liquidation Trust
contact info
Defendant
L-R Revelation Holdings, L.P.
THE CORPORATION TRUST COMPANY CORPORATION TRUST CENTER 1209 ORANGE ST
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
L-R Revelation Holdings, L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Inmet Mining, LLC
144 E. Marketplace Blvd.
Knoxville, TN 37922
Represented By
Jay Edward Ingle
Jackson Kelly PLLC
contact info

GPO Jul 07 2023
Memorandum Opinion (RE: related document(s)7 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Counter-Defendant Inmet Mining, LLC, Plaintiff Inmet Mining, LLC) (alf)
GPO Aug 24 2023
Memorandum Opinion (RE: related document(s)71 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Counter-Defendant Black Mountain Marketing and Sales LP, Counter-Defendant Javelin Global Commodities (US) LLP) (alf)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, February 14, 2025
121 121 16 pgs order Order re: Appeal (District Court) Tue 02/18 10:19 AM
Order By District Court Judge Robert E. Wier, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 7:23-CV-89, DISMISSED AS MOOT Related [+] (awd)
Related: [-] 104 Notice of Appeal filed by Counter-Claimant/Defendant Blackjewel Liquidation Trust