Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00194
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday May 03, 2023 2:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Shaun Healy (1)
Represented By
Jasmine J. Johnson
Federal Defender Program
contact info
Harold Mark Garfinkel
Law Offices Of Hal M. Garfinkel
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Saqib Mohammad Hussain
Doj-Usao
contact info
Pretrial Services
contact info
Elham M. Peirson
Doj-Usao
contact info
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info

GPO Jul 31 2023
PROTECTIVE Order Governing Discovery as to Shaun Healy. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/31/2023. Mailed notice. (ecw, )

Docket last updated: 09/15/2023 8:26 PM CDT
Monday, April 03, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT signed by Honorable Maria Valdez as to Shaun Healy (1) (exr, )
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER as to Shaun Healy: Arrest warrant issued to HSI as to Defendant Shaun Healy. Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 4/3/2023. (exr, )
Related: [-]
3 3 ARREST WARRANT issued to U.S. Marshal as to Shaun Healy (exr, )
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION by USA to seal complaint, affidavit and arrest warrant as to Shaun Healy (exr, )
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Shaun Healy signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 4/3/2023. (exr, )
Related: [-]