Original Case: 1:21-cv-23079

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-usc-11380
Typeu.s. civil / u.s. defendant - non plra
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2023
Last checked: Thursday May 04, 2023 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By
U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida
U.S. Attorney Service - SFL
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JONATHAN ALEXANDER GARCIA
Represented By
Sarah H. Bohr
Bohr & Harrington, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2023 4:30 AM EDT
Thursday, April 27, 2023
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jonathan Alexander Garcia on 04/26/2023. Fee Status: IFP Granted. 04/27/2023 Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/16/2023 as to Appellant Jonathan Alexander Garcia. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/30/2023 as to Appellee Commissioner of Social Security.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 1 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 30 pgs USDC ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [ECF NOS. 20 & 22] DE# 27