Original Case: 1:21-cv-00003

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-civil-01386
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:May 02, 2023
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
HB EMPLOYEE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Julia R. Shackleton
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CARLINE VILBON
Represented By
Carline Vilbon
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/01/2025 5:09 AM EDT
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
Request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellant Carline Vilbon was granted in the district court by order dated 04/28/2023. 23-1386 (JAW)
Related: [-]
Request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellant Carline Vilbon was granted in the district court by order dated 04/28/2023. 23-1386 (JW)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #33) filed by Appellant Carline Vilbon. 23-1386 (JW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF