Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:23-cv-00454
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12117 Americans With Disabilities Act- Enforcement
Case Filed:May 03, 2023
Last checked: Monday Oct 30, 2023 4:41 AM EDT
defendant
Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Represented By
Vincent Avallone
K&l Gates Llp (nj)
contact info
Joshua David Rinschler
K&l Gates Llp (nj)
contact info
plaintiff
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By
Miles L. Uhlar
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (mi)
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, March 08, 2024
31 31 10 pgs order Order on Consent Decree Fri 03/08 3:38 PM
CONSENT DECREE granting proposed consent decree30 ; closing the case; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Consent Decree (Proposed) Fri 03/08 1:56 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE by plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Uhlar, Miles)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
29 29 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Mon 01/29 1:05 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 3/18/2024 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; joint status report due by 3/11/2024; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
28 28 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Fri 01/26 10:16 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to complaint26 filed by defendant Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/24 9:18 AM
ORDER striking answer26 ; Defendant shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 01/23 1:06 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint14 with affirmative defenses by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
25 25 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Proposed Order Tue 01/09 2:44 PM
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part motion to dismiss16 ; defendant shall file an answer to the amended complaint within 14 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
24 24 respm Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count Fri 08/11 10:28 AM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Reply to Response to Motion23 filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/11 10:27 AM
REPLY to response to motion16 filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
22 22 respm Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count Fri 07/28 2:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response to Motion21 filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Uhlar, Miles)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Response to Motion Fri 07/28 2:21 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 16 filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Uhlar, Miles)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
20 20 motion Proposed Order Fri 06/30 10:25 AM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by defendant Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Affidavit in Support Fri 06/30 10:24 AM
AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim16 filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EEOC Press Release,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - EEOC Letter of Determination,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - May 9, 2022 Letter from Defendant's counsel to the EEOC,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - September 16, 2020 email from Plaintiff
18 18 respm Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count Fri 06/30 10:21 AM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Memorandum in Support of a Motion17 filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
17 17 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of a Motion Fri 06/30 10:20 AM
MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim16 filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Fri 06/30 10:12 AM
MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Mead Johnson Nutrition Company; (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 06/30 10:06 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua David Rinschler on behalf of defendant Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Rinschler, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Proposed Order Fri 06/23 9:49 AM
ORDER dismissing as moot motion to dismiss5 ; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/16 3:17 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mead Johnson Nutrition Company filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Uhlar, Miles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
13 13 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/06 3:25 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser Group plc, Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser Limited, Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser (Health) Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent MJ UK Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent MJ USA Holdings LLC for Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/01 2:31 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Mead Johnson Nutrition Company served on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/30/2023 (Uhlar, Miles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order Regarding Response to Motion Tue 05/30 3:49 PM
ORDER: plaintiff must file an amended complaint or a response to the motion to dismiss5 ; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/30 8:50 AM
ORDER that Defendant file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
9 9 motion Proposed Order Fri 05/26 2:49 PM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding ECF No. 5 (Defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim) by defendant Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Affidavit in Support Fri 05/26 2:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim5 Declaration of Vincent N. Avallone filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EEOC Press Release,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - EEOC Letter of Determination,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - May 9, 2022 Letter from Defendant's counsel to the EEOC,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - September 16, 2020 email from Plaintiff
7 7 respm Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count Fri 05/26 2:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion6 filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Fri 05/26 2:28 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 5 filed by Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/26 2:27 PM
MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Mead Johnson Nutrition Company; (Avallone, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 05/04 3:57 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (slk)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Thu 05/04 1:47 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Uhlar, Miles)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Thu 05/04 9:48 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (slk)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Thu 05/04 9:49 AM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Mead Johnson Nutrition Company (not provided to the court at time of filing) (slk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/03 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Mead Johnson Nutrition Company filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Uhlar, Miles)
Related: [-]