Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-42331

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:23-ap-04180
Nature of Suit31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:May 03, 2023
Terminated:Dec 21, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C., a Michigan Limited Liability Company
31550 Northwestern Highway Suite 200
Farmington Hills, MI 48334
Represented By
Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
James Galbraith
31550 Northwestern Highway Suite 200
Farmington Hills, MI 48334
Represented By
James Galbraith
contact info
Plaintiff
John J. Schlicht
2590 LeRoy Lane
West Bloomfield, MI 48324
Represented By
Charles J. Schneider
contact info
Plaintiff
Shirley M. Schlicht
2590 LeRoy Lane
West Bloomfield, MI 48324
Represented By
Charles J. Schneider
contact info
Plaintiff
Maeleigh Inc.
2590 Leroy Lane
West Bloomfield, MI 48324
Represented By
Charles J. Schneider
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, March 18, 2024
court Minute Entry. Case Closed Mon 03/18 1:00 PM
Minute Entry. Case Closed. Related [+] (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] 16 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Tue 01/09 4:16 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Trial date set for 04/09/2024 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St.. (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] 16 Scheduling Order
Thursday, December 21, 2023
40 40 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 12/21 2:48 PM
Order Granting The Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Granting Summary Judgment For The Defendants, And Dismissing All Counts Of The Plaintiffs' Complaint With Prejudice, And Declining to Sanction Plaintiffs Or Their Attorney Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 8
39 39 26 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Thu 12/21 2:34 PM
Opinion Regarding The Defendants' Motion To Dimiss Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C., Defendant James Galbraith
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 12/21 2:51 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:23-ap-4180 : Denied. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/21 2:53 PM
Adversary Case 2:23-ap-4180 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Mon 12/18 4:53 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 09:00AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St.. (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] 16 Scheduling Order
Thursday, December 07, 2023
38 38 1 pgs order order (Generic) Thu 12/07 10:48 AM
Order Cancelling December 8, 2023 Bench Opinion Hearing Re:8 Motion. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Hearing Cancelled Fri 12/08 5:04 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Cancelled. Related [+] (lbryant)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant James Galbraith, Defendant Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.
Sunday, December 03, 2023
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Adjourned Hearing Mon 12/04 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Adjourned Hearing Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 12/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Notice of Adjourned Hearing (AP)
Friday, December 01, 2023
36 36 court Notice of Adjourned Hearing (AP) Fri 12/01 9:43 AM
Notice of Adjourned BENCH OPINION. Related [+] Bench Opinion to be issued on 12/8/2023 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St. for8 , (Vozniak, Mary)Note: with the exception of trials in adversary proceedings, and evidentiary hearings in contested matters, all conferences and hearings in cases pending before Judge Tucker will be conducted by telephone. At least five minutes before the scheduled time for hearing, counsel, parties, and all other persons wishing to attend the hearing should call (888)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C., Defendant James Galbraith
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
35 35 audio . Wed 11/29 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/29/2023 1:31:19 PM ]. File Size [ 21192 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:44:09 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (BK) Wed 11/29 2:20 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing held; motion taken under advisement; Court to issue oral bench opinion at telephonic hearing to be held on Friday, December 1, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. Related [+] (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant James Galbraith, Defendant Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.
Monday, November 13, 2023
34 34 answer Response Mon 11/13 12:09 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiffs John J. Schlicht, Shirley M. Schlicht (Schneider, Charles)
Related: [-] 25 Request for Admissions
33 33 order Striking Document (text) Mon 11/13 11:57 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the incorrect event has been used (Counsel should use the "Response" event code) Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Thomas J. Tucker (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] Reply - motions32 Reply - motions filed by Plaintiff John J. Schlicht, Plaintiff Shirley M. Schlicht
Thursday, November 09, 2023
32 32 answer Reply Thu 11/09 10:19 AM
Reply to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiffs John J. Schlicht, Shirley M. Schlicht (Schneider, Charles)
Related: [-] 25 Request for Admissions filed by Defendant Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C., Defendant James Galbraith
Friday, October 27, 2023
31 31 order Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing Fri 10/27 4:47 PM
Order Extending Certain Pretrial Deadlines, And Adjourning Final Pretrial Conference And Trial Related [+]. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 3/18/2024 at 09:00AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St. Trial date set for 4/9/2024 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St. (kcm)
Related: [-] 30 Stipulation,16 Scheduling Order
30 30 misc Stipulation Fri 10/27 12:23 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiffs and Defendants Re: Adjourning Rule 26(f) Dates and Scheduling Order . Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Thu 10/26 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 10/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Notice of Hearing (AP)
Monday, October 23, 2023
28 28 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Mon 10/23 3:47 PM
Notice of Hearing . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 11/29/2023 at 01:30 PM Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St. for8 , (lbryant)Note: with the exception of trials in adversary proceedings, and evidentiary hearings in contested matters, all conferences and hearings in cases pending before Judge Tucker will be conducted by telephone. At least five minutes before the scheduled time for hearing, counsel, parties, and all other persons wishing to attend the hearing should call (888)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C., Defendant James Galbraith
Thursday, October 12, 2023
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/12 11:15 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C. Related [+]. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-] 23 Deposition Notice,24 Deposition Notice,25 Request for Admissions,26 Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents
26 26 misc Interrogatories Thu 10/12 11:12 AM
Interrogatories , First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Request for Admissions Thu 10/12 11:10 AM
First Request for Admissions to Plaintiffs Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Deposition Notice Thu 10/12 11:06 AM
Deposition Notice of Shirley M. Schlicht Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Deposition Notice Thu 10/12 11:04 AM
Deposition Notice of John J. Schlicht Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
22 22 answer Reply Wed 09/20 11:11 AM
Supplemental Reply to Related [+] Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C., Defendant James Galbraith
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
21 21 answer Response Wed 08/30 9:35 AM
Supplemental Response to Related [+] Defendants' Submission of Additional Material Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re: Failure to State a Claim
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Submission of Additional Material
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
20 20 3 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Wed 08/16 3:22 PM
Order Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Related [+]. (Sam R.)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C., Defendant James Galbraith
Friday, August 04, 2023
19 19 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Fri 08/04 11:20 AM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiffs Maeleigh Inc., John J. Schlicht, Shirley M. Schlicht Related [+]. (Schneider, Charles)
Related: [-] 15 Report Parties Rule 26(f) Conference
Thursday, July 06, 2023
18 18 answer Reply Thu 07/06 3:30 PM
Reply to Related [+] Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C., Defendant James Galbraith
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9
Monday, June 26, 2023
17 17 audio . Mon 06/26 10:05 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/26/2023 9:00:34 AM ]. File Size [ 3352 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:59 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/26 10:04 AM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order . Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 12/18/2023 at 09:00AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St.. Trial date set for 1/9/2024 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St.. (jmk)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Initial Scheduling Conference Held Mon 06/26 9:14 AM
Minute Entry.Initial scheduling conference held; scheduling order to follow Related [+] Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 12/18/2023 at 09:00AM By Telephone. Trial date set for 01/09/2024 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St.. (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
15 15 misc Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference Tue 06/20 2:10 PM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
14 14 answer Response Fri 06/16 10:37 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiffs John J. Schlicht, Shirley M. Schlicht (Schneider, Charles)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re: Failure to State a Claim
13 13 order Striking Document (text) Fri 06/16 9:38 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the included Notice of Voluntary Dismissal must be filed as a separate pleading Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Thomas J. Tucker (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] Response12 Response filed by Plaintiff John J. Schlicht, Plaintiff Shirley M. Schlicht
Thursday, June 15, 2023
12 12 answer Response Thu 06/15 11:44 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiffs John J. Schlicht, Shirley M. Schlicht (Schneider, Charles)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re: Failure to State a Claim
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/15 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 06/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Monday, June 12, 2023
10 10 court Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference Mon 06/12 10:57 AM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 6/26/2023 at 09:00 AM Remotely - See Notice for Details. (Vozniak, Mary) Note: effective beginning April 14, 2022, with the exception of trials in adversary proceedings, and evidentiary hearings in contested matters, all conferences and hearings in cases pending before Judge Tucker will be conducted by telephone. At least five minutes before the scheduled time for hearing, counsel and parties should call (888)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
9 9 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 05/25 1:31 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership of Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C. Filed by Defendant Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 05/25 12:30 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re: Failure to State a Claim Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Notice of Motion
Att: 3 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Att: 5 Affidavit Statement of No Affidavits
Att: 6 Exhibit Documentary Exhibits
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 05/09 3:57 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.. (Piggins, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 05/09 3:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendants James Galbraith, Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C.. (Wilson, Frances)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/04 1:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on James Galbraith 5/4/2023; Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C. 5/4/2023 (Schneider, Charles)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 05/04 10:10 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Corporate parents added to case: Maeleigh Inc.. Filed by Plaintiffs John J. Schlicht, Shirley M. Schlicht Related [+]. (Schneider, Charles)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Thu 05/04 9:52 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing. Related [+] Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 5/11/2023. (kcm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John J. Schlicht, Plaintiff Shirley M. Schlicht, Plaintiff Maeleigh Inc.
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 05/03 2:38 PM
Summons Issued on Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C. Answer Due 06/2/2023; James Galbraith Answer Due 06/2/2023 (Schneider, Charles)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/03 2:38 PM
Adversary case 23-04180 (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))): Complaint by John J. Schlicht, Shirley M. Schlicht, Maeleigh Inc. against Union Lake Golf Club, L.L.C., James Galbraith. Fee Amount $350. (Schneider, Charles)
Related: [-]