California Central District Court
Case #: 8:23-mj-00203
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2023
Terminated:Apr 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday May 05, 2023 12:21 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney SA-CR
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Andris Pukke (1)
Terminated: 04/05/2023
Represented By
Samuel Owen Cross
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2023 2:35 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
Notice to Southern District of New York of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Defendant Andris Pukke. Your case number is: 23CR168. The clerk will transmit any restricted documents via email. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any text-only entries via the case number link. The following document link(s) is also provided:3 Initial Appearance - Arrest on Out of District Warrant - Rule 5(c)(3) (fka Rule 40). If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to email address CrimIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov (mhe)
Related: [-]
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Andris Pukke, originating in the Southern District of New York. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:1343. Signed by agent Timothy L Jacoby II, FBI, Special Agent. USA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Andris Pukke; defendants Year of Birth: 1969; date of arrest: 4/5/2023 (mhe)
Related: [-]
3 3 7 pgs MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott as to Defendant Andris Pukke. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and states true name is as charged. Attorney: Samuel Owen Cross for Andris Pukke, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders bail set as: Andris Pukke (1) $75,000 Appearance Bond, see attached for terms and conditions. Court orders defendant held to answer to Southern District of New York. Bond to Transfer. Defendant ordered to report on date to be provided by government counsel. RELEASE ORDER NO 41872 Court Smart: CS 4/5/23. (mhe)
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALED Defendant Andris Pukke arrested on warrant issued by the USDC Southern District of New York at New York.(mhe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging Documents
5 5 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Andris Pukke. (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Andris Pukke. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER OF RIGHTS approved by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott as to Defendant Andris Pukke. (mhe)
Related: [-]
8 8 DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Andris Pukke, declaring that my passport and any other travel documents are in the possession of federal authorities. If any such document is returned to me during the pendency of this case, I will immediately surrender it to the U.S. Pretrial Services Agency. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (mhe)
Related: [-]