Maryland District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00128
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 06, 2023 3:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Tyquan Ford (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
LaRai Everett
Doj-Usao
contact info
Patricia Corwin Mclane
U.S. Attorney S Office (usa/fpd)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2023 4:09 AM EDT
Thursday, April 06, 2023
1 1 3 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Tyquan Ford (1) count(s) 1. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 Motion/Order to Seal Case as to Tyquan Ford. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/6/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]