Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Richard G Stearns
Case #: 1:23-cv-11001
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:May 08, 2023
Terminated:Oct 18, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 04, 2023 5:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Joseph Biden
Represented By
Zach A. Avallone
Us Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Alexander N. Ely
Doj-Civ
contact info
Brad P. Rosenberg
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division, Federal Programs
contact info
Rayford A. Farquhar
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Janet Yellen
Represented By
Zach A. Avallone
Us Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Alexander N. Ely
Doj-Civ
contact info
Brad P. Rosenberg
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division, Federal Programs
contact info
Rayford A. Farquhar
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
National Association of Government Employees, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas H. Geoghegan
Despres, Schwartz & Geoghegan, Ltd.
contact info
Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew Carrieri
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info

GPO Oct 18 2023
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 45 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The motion to dismiss is allowed, and the Clerk shall close the case. (RGS, law3)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 30, 2024
68 68 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 12/31 8:09 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to61 Notice of Appeal filed by National Association of Government Employees, Inc. (Martin, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]