Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 4:23-cv-00088
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1319 Clean Water Act
Case Filed:May 08, 2023
Terminated:Jul 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 04, 2023 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.
Represented By
Kathryn E. Hopkins
Kmcl Law
contact info
Gregory W. Blount
Kazmarek Mowrey Cloud Laseter LLP
contact info
Defendant
Town of Trion, Georgia
Plaintiff
Coosa River Basin Initiative
Represented By
Robert Hutton Brown
Southern Environmental Law Center
contact info
Christopher J. Bowers
Southern Environmental Law Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 07/11 3:49 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (lwb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
11 11 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Tue 07/11 1:53 PM
ORDER Granting7 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on July 10, 2023. (lwb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 07/07 12:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Hopkins, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/07 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn E. Hopkins on behalf of Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. (Hopkins, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/26 10:27 AM
NOTICE by Coosa River Basin Initiative re7 Second MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment (Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit United States Notice of No Objection to Settlement_CRBI v. MVM and Trion, GA
Thursday, June 01, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 06/01 9:19 AM
Submission of7 Second MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
7 7 motion Approve Consent Judgment Wed 05/31 9:14 AM
Second MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Coosa River Basin Initiative.(Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A1 - Proposed Consent Decree
Friday, May 26, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/30 9:57 AM
ORDER VACATING3 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/26/2023. (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/23 9:29 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coosa River Basin Initiative. Town of Trion, Georgia waiver mailed on 5/8/2023, answer due 7/7/2023. (Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/15 1:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coosa River Basin Initiative. Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. waiver mailed on 5/8/2023, answer due 7/7/2023. (Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
3 3 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Fri 05/12 8:26 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/11/2023. (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
2 2 4 pgs motion Approve Consent Judgment Tue 05/09 10:11 AM
Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Coosa River Basin Initiative.(Bowers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree
Monday, May 08, 2023
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/08 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Coosa River Basin Initiative. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12583333)(tmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice to Trion,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Notice to Mount Vernon Mills,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet