Maryland District Court
Judge:Richard D Bennett
Case #: 1:23-cv-01215
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:May 08, 2023
Terminated:Feb 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 04, 2023 6:11 AM EDT
Defendant
ASRC Federal Data Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Jessica Lynn Farmer
Holland And Knight LLP
contact info
Defendant
Health Care Management Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth Anne Scully
Baker And Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Reynolds Burger
Represented By
James P Ulwick
Kramon And Graham PA
contact info
Ashley M. Crooks
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
James J Pizzirusso
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Steven M Nathan
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
Robert M. Turkewitz
Law Office Of Robert M. Turkewitz, LLC
contact info
Brian M. Knowles
Knowles Law Firm, PC
contact info

GPO Feb 07 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/7/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
38 38 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 07/23 4:42 PM
RULE 42(b) MANDATE of USCA as to34 Notice of Appeal filed by Barbara Reynolds Burger. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
37 37 appeal USCA Order Tue 07/23 4:39 PM
ORDER of USCA Dismissing this appeal as to34 Notice of Appeal filed by Barbara Reynolds Burger. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
36 36 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 02/28 5:00 PM
USCA Case Number 24-1180 for34 Notice of Appeal filed by Barbara Reynolds Burger. Case Manager - Anisha Walker. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
35 35 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 02/27 11:14 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re34 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
34 34 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 02/23 5:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to33 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,32 Memorandum Opinion by Barbara Reynolds Burger. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AMDDC-11107620.(Pizzirusso, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 02/07 11:15 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Dismiss; granting21 Motion to Dismiss; closing case. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/7/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
32 32 22 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 02/07 11:12 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/7/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
31 31 12 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/21 3:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ASRC Federal Data Solutions, LLC.(Farmer, Jessica)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 09/21 2:43 PM
RESPONSE in Support re20 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC filed by Health Care Management Solutions, LLC.(Scully, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/31 5:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC ,21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Barbara Reynolds Burger.(Ulwick, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 07/24 12:06 PM
ORDER granting27 Consent Motion for Leave to File One Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/24/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
27 27 motion Leave to File Document Fri 07/21 5:22 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File One Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Barbara Reynolds Burger(Knowles, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 17, 2023
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/17 10:25 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ashley M. Crooks. Directing attorney Ashley M. Crooks to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/13 2:29 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants'20 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC and to21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/13/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/13 1:58 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ashley M. Crooks (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10706045.) by Barbara Reynolds Burger(Nathan, Steven)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/13 1:52 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC ,21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Barbara Reynolds Burger(Pizzirusso, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/11 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Nathan on behalf of Barbara Reynolds Burger (Nathan, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
21 21 3 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/10 10:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ASRC Federal Data Solutions, LLC(Farmer, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
20 20 motion Dismiss Mon 07/10 6:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC by Health Care Management Solutions, LLC(Scully, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS
Friday, June 30, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 07/05 12:43 PM
ORDER granting18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to1 Complaint; ASRC Federal Data Solutions, LLC answer due 7/10/2023. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/30/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 06/29 4:18 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,1 Complaint, (or otherwise respond) through July 10,2023 by ASRC Federal Data Solutions, LLC(Farmer, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
17 17 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 05/31 4:40 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ASRC Federal Data Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ASRC Federal Holding Company, LLC, Corporate Parent ASRC Arctic Slope Regional Corporation for ASRC Federal Data Solutions, LLC.(Farmer, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/31 3:56 PM
ORDER granting15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (or otherwise respond). Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/31/2023. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/31 3:15 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (or otherwise respond) by ASRC Federal Data Solutions, LLC(Farmer, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 05/31 9:48 AM
ORDER granting11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Plead, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/30/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/30 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Scully on behalf of Health Care Management Solutions, LLC (Scully, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 05/30 2:40 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Health Care Management Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent HMS Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Healthcare Management Solutions ESOP Trust, Other Affiliate Healthcare Management Solutions, LLC for Health Care Management Solutions, LLC.(Scully, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/30 2:34 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Plead, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Health Care Management Solutions, LLC(Scully, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER
Friday, May 26, 2023
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/26 10:51 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert M. Turkewitz (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10622732.) by Barbara Reynolds Burger(Ulwick, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Fri 05/26 10:47 AM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. Knowles by Barbara Reynolds Burger. The fee has already been paid.(Ulwick, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Signatures Fri 05/26 8:47 AM
QC NOTICE:5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Barbara Reynolds Burger needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/26 1:07 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brian M. Knowles. Directing attorney Brian M. Knowles to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 5/26/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/26 1:12 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert M. Turkewitz. Directing attorney Robert M. Turkewitz to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 5/26/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/25 4:44 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. Knowles (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10621747.) by Barbara Reynolds Burger(Ulwick, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/10 4:38 PM
NOTICE by Barbara Reynolds Burger re1 Complaint, filing Exhibit 1 and 2 inadvertently omitted from original filing of Complaint(Ulwick, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/10 10:16 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to ASRC Federal Data Solutions, LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 05/09 12:02 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to ASRC Federal Data Solutions, LLC, Health Care Management Solutions, LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 summons 2
Monday, May 08, 2023
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/08 6:38 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against ASRC Federal Data Solutions, LLC, Health Care Management Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10587064.), filed by Barbara Reynolds Burger.(Ulwick, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons