Nebraska District Court
Judge:John M Gerrard
Referred: Michael D Nelson
Case #: 4:23-cv-03086
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 09, 2023
Terminated:Jul 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 05, 2023 10:40 AM CST
Defaulted Defendant
C C A Group, LLC
4213 N. Buffalo Road Suite 3
Orchard Park, NY 14127
Defaulted Defendant
Daniel Frederick
119 Avian Way
Lancaster, NY 14086
Defaulted Defendant
Frederick Debt Management, LLC
3221 Southwestern Blvd, No. 238
Orchard Park, NY 14127
Plaintiff
Dustin Korth
Represented By
James J. Parr
Agruss Law Firm
contact info
Ryan M. Platt
Agruss Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, July 22, 2024
17 17 order Judgment - Pro Se Mon 07/22 3:31 PM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED: Judgment is entered in favor of Korth and against Frederick Debt Management, CCA Group, and Daniel Frederick. Korth shall recover from the defendants the sum of $1,000 as statutory damages, attorney fees of $2,222.70, and costs in the amount of $606.00, totaling $3,828.70. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copies mailed to defaulted defendants)(TCL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases
16 16 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 07/22 3:25 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Korth's motion for default judgment (filing14 ) is granted.Judgment is entered in favor of Korth and against the defendants, jointly and severally, in the sum of $1,000 as statutory damages, attorney's fees of $2,222.70, and costs of $606.00, with post-judgment interest thereon at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1961. The Clerk is directed to award costs in this matter. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copies mailed to defaulted defendants)(TCL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
15 15 order Order - GO 2024-3 (TEXT ONLY) Thu 04/11 9:18 AM
GENERAL ORDER 2024-03 - Following Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis's appointment as a United States District Judge on April 10, 2024, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson as set forth in this order. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
14 14 motion Default Judgment Wed 09/27 6:35 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against FREDERICK DEBT MANAGEMENT, LLC, C C A GROUP, LLC, DANIEL FREDERICK by Attorney James J. Parr on behalf of Plaintiff Dustin Korth.(Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion for Costs and Attorneys' Fees,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit required by Local Rule 55.1(c)(2)
Monday, September 25, 2023
13 13 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/25 2:48 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice12 for attorney Ryan M. Platt. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_doc Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/25 12:55 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4945109 by Attorney Ryan M. Platt on behalf of Plaintiff Dustin Korth.(Platt, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Friday, July 21, 2023
11 11 order Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 07/21 10:55 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants C C A Group, LLC, Daniel Frederick, Frederick Debt Management, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copies mailed to defendants)(TCL)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Clerks Entry of Default Fri 07/21 10:22 AM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against FREDERICK DEBT MANAGEMENT, LLC, C C A GROUP, LLC, and DANIEL FREDERICK by Attorney James J. Parr on behalf of Plaintiff Dustin Korth.(Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default
Thursday, July 20, 2023
9 9 motion Clerks Entry of Default Thu 07/20 3:52 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against FREDERICK DEBT MANAGEMENT, LLC, C C A GROUP, LLC, and DANIEL FREDERICK by Attorney James J. Parr on behalf of Plaintiff Dustin Korth.(Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default
8 8 motion Clerks Entry of Default Thu 07/20 3:22 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against FREDERICK DEBT MANAGEMENT, LLC, C C A GROUP, LLC, and DANIEL FEDERICK by Attorney James J. Parr on behalf of Plaintiff Dustin Korth.(Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default
Thursday, June 01, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/01 10:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant C C A Group, LLC on 5/25/2023. (Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/18 10:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Daniel Frederick on 5/12/2023. (Parr, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/18 10:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Frederick Debt Management, LLC on 5/13/2023. (Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 05/09 11:32 AM
Summons Issued as to defendants C C A Group, LLC, Daniel Frederick, Frederick Debt Management, LLC regarding Complaint,1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (NMW)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Tue 05/09 11:28 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (NMW)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Requested Tue 05/09 11:21 AM
Summons Requested as to all Defendants regarding Complaint,1 .(Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/09 11:20 AM
COMPLAINT against C C A Group, LLC, Daniel Frederick, Frederick Debt Management, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4859799), by Attorney James J. Parr on behalf of Dustin Korth(Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet