Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00076
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday May 10, 2023 3:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Tamara Denise Perdue (1)
Represented By
Justin J. Roberts
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Cleveland
contact info
Federal Public Defender
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Colleen Egan
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2023 4:00 AM EDT
Thursday, February 09, 2023
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
1 1 UNSEALED INDICTMENT filed by USA as to Tamara Denise Perdue (1) count(s) 1, 2.. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form and Signature Page
3 3 Motion to Seal Indictment filed by United States of America as to Tamara Denise Perdue (1). (L,MI)
Related: [-]
4 4 Order granting the government's3 Motion to Seal indictment until the arrest of Defendant Tamara Denise Perdue (1). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 2/9/2023. (L,MI)
Related: [-]