California Northern District Court
Judge:Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Case #: 3:23-cv-02214
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:May 05, 2023
Terminated:May 17, 2024
Case in other court:Santa Clara Superior Court, 23CV411463
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 01, 2023 6:03 AM PDT
Defendant
Simpson Imports LTD
Represented By
Yelena Gankin
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Claudia Maria Vetesi
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrea Valiente
Represented By
Luke Sironski-White
Bursor And Fisher P.A.
contact info
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Matthew A Girardi
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
L Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info

GPO Feb 20 2024
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss, granting 15 Request for Judicial Notice. First Amended Complaint due by 3/12/2024.(amolc1, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 17, 2024
46 46 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/17 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Andrea Valiente (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
45 45 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 04/29 5:43 PM
ORDER re 44 Joint Status Report. Plaintiff shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal by no later than May 29, 2024. The deadline for a further case management statement is continued to May 30, 2024 (by noon). The case management conference currently set for May 9, 2024 is continued to June 6, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs first amended complaint is continued to June 14, 2024. The Court will vacate these deadlines once Plaintiff files the required notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on April 29, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
44 44 misc Status Report Mon 04/29 4:51 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Simpson Imports LTD. (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
43 43 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 03/13 12:52 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting as modified 42 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Answer or Responsive Pleading due 05/17/2024. Status Report re Outcome of Mediation due by 5/1/2024.(amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
42 42 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 03/13 11:20 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Andrea Valiente. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
41 41 28 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/12 5:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Simpson Imports LTD. Filed by Andrea Valiente.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redlined Version - First Amended Class Action Complaint
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
40 40 misc Transcript Tue 02/27 11:11 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/25/24, before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: 10:59 - 11:33. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Redaction Request due 3/19/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2024. (Jauregui, Tara)
Related: [-] 34 Transcript Order (s)34
Monday, February 26, 2024
39 39 misc Transcript Mon 02/26 2:43 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/25/24, before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Related [+] (Jauregui, Tara)
Related: [-] 34 Transcript Order (s)34
38 38 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 02/26 1:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 37 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by noon on 5/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on February 26, 2024. (amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
37 37 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 02/23 2:52 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Simpson Imports LTD.(Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Claudia M. Vetesi
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
36 36 25 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/20 7:27 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss, granting 15 Request for Judicial Notice. First Amended Complaint due by 3/12/2024.(amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
35 35 misc Transcript Order Fri 01/26 2:20 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/25/2024 before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin by Andrea Valiente, for Recorded Proceeding - San Francisco. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Transcript Order Fri 01/26 10:36 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/25/2024 before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin by Simpson Imports LTD, for Recorded Proceeding - San Francisco. (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
33 33 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 01/25 12:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin: Motion Hearing held on 1/25/2024. 14 Motion to Dismiss hearing held; argument heard; matter submitted. Court to issue Order. Total Time in Court: 34 minutes. Court Reporter: Recorded via Zoom. Plaintiff Attorney: Luke Sironski-White and L. Timothy Fisher. Defendant Attorney: Yelena Gankin and Claudia Maria Vetesi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2024)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
32 32 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/24 2:36 PM
Clerk's Notice Modifying Motion Hearing Time.14 Motion to Dismiss reset for 1/25/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
31 31 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 12/22 6:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING 30 STIPULATION Continuing Hearing on Defendant Simpson Imports, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2024 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on December 22, 2023. (amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 12/22 3:16 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearing on Defendant Simpson Imports, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss to January 25, 2024 filed by Simpson Imports LTD. (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
29 29 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 09/06 9:16 AM
Clerk's Notice Continuing Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/7/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
28 28 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/06 9:01 AM
Clerk's Notice Continuing14 Motion Hearing. Due to the Court's impacted calendar, the hearing is re-set to 1/4/2024 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. The parties may be able to obtain an earlier hearing date by consenting to a magistrate judge using the form available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms./] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
27 27 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/25 12:03 PM
Clerk's Notice Modifying Motion Date and Location. Motion to Dismiss14 Hearing set for 9/20/2023 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
26 26 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 08/03 9:23 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 25 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/9/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor.(ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
25 25 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 08/01 6:49 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Andrea Valiente.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher
Monday, July 31, 2023
24 24 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 07/31 9:42 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed bySimpson Imports LTD. (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-] 14 MOTION to Dismiss ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIMPSON IMPORTS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT
Friday, July 21, 2023
23 23 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 07/21 10:36 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
22 22 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 07/20 4:14 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sironski-White, Luke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
21 21 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 07/19 9:45 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 20 Stipulation RE Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's Reply due by 7/31/2023. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
20 20 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 07/18 2:04 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Simpson Imports LTD. (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
19 19 27 pgs respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 06/30 1:48 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byAndrea Valiente.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-] 14 MOTION to Dismiss ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIMPSON IMPORTS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT
Att: 1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher
Thursday, June 15, 2023
18 18 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 06/15 10:47 AM
Order as Modified by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 17 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response due by 6/30/2023. Defendant's Reply due by 7/24/2023. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2023 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 06/09 11:48 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Andrea Valiente.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
16 16 2 pgs oth_sup Declaration in Support Wed 06/07 6:50 PM
Declaration of Ruth Levi in Support of15 Request for Judicial Notice,14 MOTION to Dismiss ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIMPSON IMPORTS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed bySimpson Imports LTD. Related [+] (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-] 15 ,14
15 15 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Wed 06/07 6:48 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re14 MOTION to Dismiss ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIMPSON IMPORTS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed bySimpson Imports LTD. Related [+] (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
14 14 35 pgs motion Dismiss Wed 06/07 6:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIMPSON IMPORTS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Simpson Imports LTD. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Responses due by 6/21/2023. Replies due by 6/28/2023.(Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 06/07 6:24 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Simpson Imports LTD (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/06 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yelena Gankin (Gankin, Yelena)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/06 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Maria Vetesi (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
10 10 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 05/15 3:41 PM
Order by District Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Defendant Simpson Import LTD's Time to Respond to Complaint.(ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
9 9 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 05/11 5:00 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Defendant Simpson Import LTD.'s Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Simpson Imports LTD. (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 05/10 4:26 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/martinez-olguin_araceli-amo/. Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
7 7 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/09 10:49 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/9/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
6 6 utility ~Util - Notice Assigning/ Reassigning Case (CRJ) Tue 05/09 10:42 AM
This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at[LINK:https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/] . (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
5 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrea Valiente.. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
3 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2023 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior. Their case number is 23CV411463. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18239517). Filed bySimpson Imports LTD.(Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ruth Levi,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet