Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Sheryl H Lipman
Referred: Charmiane G Claxton
Case #: 2:23-cv-02295
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 09, 2023
Terminated:Sep 01, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 05, 2023 10:48 AM CST
Defendant
Firstsource Advantage, LLC
Plaintiff
Diamond Rayborn
100 Peabody Place Ste 150
Memphis, TN 38103


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/13 2:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diamond Rayborn as to Firstsource Advantage, LLC. (agj)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
12 12 order Judgment Fri 09/01 6:21 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/1/2023. (shl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/31 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Diamond Rayborn (csf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
10 10 service Summons Reissued Fri 08/04 12:20 PM
Summons Reissued as to Firstsource Advantage, LLC. (%CT Corporation System). Two summons and USM 285 Related [+] placed in USM's inneroffice mail for service. (jae)
Related: [-] flecting correct service address
Monday, July 31, 2023
9 9 motion Entry of Default Tue 08/01 10:08 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Diamond Rayborn.(agj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/11 9:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diamond Rayborn as to Firstsource Advantage, LLC. (agj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 06/15 2:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Firstsource Advantage, LLC. Summons (3), complaint and USM 285 prepared and placed in USM's inneroffice mail for service. (jae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
6 6 4 pgs order Order Wed 06/14 8:06 PM
ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and to Issue and Effect Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 6/14/2023. (Claxton, Charmiane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
misc Clerks Referral to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/10 2:02 PM
Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/10 1:36 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Diamond Rayborn. (csf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Wed 05/10 1:35 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act (FDCPA) against Firstsource Advantage, LLC, filed by Diamond Rayborn.(csf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Email,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Case assignment label,
Att: 4 Blank envelope placed in drop safe in basement
notice Notice LR 16.2 Wed 05/10 1:37 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
Related: [-]
notice ADR Compliance Wed 05/10 1:38 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Wed 05/10 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
Related: [-]