Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00283
Case Filed:May 08, 2023
Last checked: Thursday May 11, 2023 2:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Hojat Askari (1)
Defendant
Iman Bambooyani (2)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Pretrial Services
contact info
Brandon David Stone
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO May 26 2023
PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 5/26/2023. (rao, )PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 5/26/2023. (rao, )

Docket last updated: 05/11/2023 3:09 AM CDT
Monday, May 08, 2023
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Hojat Askari (1) count(s) 1, 2, Iman Bambooyani (2) count(s) 1. (jh, )
Related: [-]
3 3 DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (jh, )
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: To set preliminary bail at $10,000.00 and that Defendants be allowed to sign own recognizance bond as to both defendants. Mailed notice (jh, )
Related: [-]