New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00157
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2023
Last checked: Thursday May 11, 2023 3:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Akeem Chambers (1)
Represented By
Steven Zissou
Steve Zissou & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly Del Rio (2)
Represented By
Tracey E. Gaffey
Federal Defenders Of New York
contact info
Defendant
Jahziah Dindyal (3)
Represented By
John S. Wallenstein
John S. Wallenstein, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Gonzalez (4)
Represented By
John A. Diaz
Diaz & Moskowitz, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Lesly Pardo (5)
Represented By
Matthew Whitney Brissenden
Scaring & Carman, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Rob Pardo (6)
Represented By
Murray Singer
Murray E. Singer, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Jalen Rogers (7)
Represented By
Anthony M. LaPinta
Anthony M. La Pinta
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Vazquez (8)
Represented By
Kevin James Keating
Kevin J. Keating
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael R Maffei
Us Attorney'S Office/edny
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 9:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
1 1 45 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Akeem Chambers (1) count(s) 1, 2, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 31, 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37, 38, 39, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 48, 49, 58, 59, Kimberly Del Rio (2) count(s) 46, 47, Jahziah Dindyal (3) count(s) 1, 2, 54, 55, 58, 59, Jonathan Gonzalez (4) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 10, 11, 12, 13, 58, 59, Lesly Pardo (5) count(s) 1, 2, 46, 47, 56, 58, 59, Rob Pardo (6) count(s) 1, 2, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 56, 58, 59, Jalen Rogers (7) count(s) 1, 2, 32, 33, 40, 41, 42, 52, 53, 54, 55, 57, 58, 59, Jonathan Vazquez (8) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 37, 38, 39, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 46, 47, 48, 49, 50, 51, 58, 59. (GO) Modified on 5/8/2023 to correct Defendants name from Didyal to Dindyal. (GO).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Information Sheet,
Att: 2 Sealing Cover Sheet