Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:23-cv-01955
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 10, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Nov 09, 2023 6:35 AM EST
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
3M Company, The
Plaintiff
Tammy Erwin
Represented By
James Vasquez, Sr
The Law Offices Of James Vasquez PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Erwin
Represented By
James Vasquez, Sr
The Law Offices Of James Vasquez PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/30 12:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deanne Kershner, Harold Kershner, Danielle Soucy, Raymond Mallory, Daniel Czene, William Radcliff, Vincent Darby, Jeffrey Dejongh, Phung T. Dejongh, Donald Justin, Karen Hartman, Michael Hartman, Barney Adams, Brent Buck Barber, Robert Murray, Hussein Glasgow, Jason Glasgow, Jennifer Bearcub, Alfredo Andres, Doisita Andres, Brian Woods, Brian Shaver, Gina Shaver, Aimee Strick, Steve Strick, Brian Montgomery, Sheree Montgomery, David Anderson, Lance Kent, Linda Kent, Brad Eckmeder, Robert Seelye, Tina Seelye Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Vasquez, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
4 4 service Certificate of Service Mon 05/15 1:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy Erwin re 3 MDL Member Case Opened,1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (Vasquez, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
3 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 5/10/2023), Timothy Erwin et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01955-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Texas (sshe, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 05/12 10:29 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 05/12 10:30 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 5/10/2023), Timothy Erwin et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01955-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Texas (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/12 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11093333.), filed by Timothy Erwin, Tammy Erwin. Service due by 8/8/2023(sshe, )
Related: [-]