Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Brian A Jackson
Case #: 3:23-mc-00084
Causeno cause specified
Case Filed:May 11, 2023
Terminated:Sep 14, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
24 24 appeal USSC Order Tue 01/14 4:27 PM
ORDER of the Supreme Court of the United States. Action Taken: The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
23 23 misc Attorney Disciplinary Letter Fri 06/21 11:58 AM
Letter dated June 19, 2024 from the Louisiana Supreme Court to the United States Supreme Court Re: Attorney Disciplinary Proceedings. Action Taken: Suspended from the practice of law on a reciprocal basis for a period of one year as stated herein. (EDC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
22 22 appeal USCA Order Mon 03/18 2:11 PM
ORDER of USCA as to13 Notice of Appeal filed by Edward Moses, Jr.. Action Taken at the Circuit: This matter was dismissed in light of Appellants request to proceed as a sanctioned litigant being denied (NLT)
Related: [-]
21 21 appeal USCA Order Mon 03/18 2:10 PM
ORDER of USCA as to13 Notice of Appeal filed by Edward Moses, Jr.. Action Taken at the Circuit: Mosess Motion for Permission to Proceed after Sanction is DENIED. Moses remains subject to this courts prior $2,500 sanction. He is once again WARNED that any future frivolous or repetitive filings in this court or any court subject to its jurisdiction will subject him to additional and progressively more severe sanctions. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
20 20 misc Attorney Disciplinary Letter Wed 02/28 11:42 AM
Order dated February 20, 2024 from the Eastern District of Louisiana Re: Attorney Disciplinary Proceedings. Action Taken: Suspended for one year retroactive to the date of suspension by the Middle District of Louisiana. (EDC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
19 19 misc Return on Certified Mail Mon 12/18 3:34 PM
Return on Certified Mail re18 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. (NLT)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/14 8:48 AM
RULING AND ORDER: The Reurged17 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Edward Moses, Jr., is DENIED. Consistent with Appellate Rule 24(a)(4), the Clerk shall immediately notify Mr. Moses and the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit of this Order, including via regular and certified mail, return receipt requested to Respondent Edward Moses, Jr. at the address listed on PACER. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson, and Judge John W. DeGravelles on 12/13/2023. (LLH)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
17 17 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/11 9:28 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Edward Moses, Jr. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
appeal USCA Case Number Mon 12/04 4:03 PM
USCA Case Number 23-30852 for13 Notice of Appeal filed by Edward Moses, Jr.. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
15 15 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/01 3:21 PM
RULING AND ORDER denying14 MOTION to Waive Filing Fee on Appeal filed by Edward Moses, Jr. Form 4 is attached here should Mr. Moses seek to re-file his motion in this Court. Consistent with Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(4), the Clerk shall immediately notify Mr. Moses and the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit of this Order, including via regular and certified mail. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson, and Judge John W. deGravelles on 12/1/2023. (LLH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
14 14 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/30 1:50 PM
MOTION to Waive Filing Fee on Appeal by Edward Moses, Jr. (NLT)
Related: [-]
13 13 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 11/30 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL of12 Order by Edward Moses, Jr. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for New Trial Tue 10/31 11:32 AM
RULING AND ORDER denying11 Rule 60 Relief from the May 25, 2023 Judgment or Order, MOTION for Amended or Additional Findings of Facts, MOTION for New Trial. Mr. Moses must obtain permission from a judge of this Court before filing any additional pleading or action that seeks to re-assert. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson, and Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/30/2023. (JEG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief (First) New Trial Thu 10/12 4:26 PM
Rule 60 Relief from the May 25, 2023 Judgment or Order, MOTION for Amended or Additional Findings of Facts, MOTION for New Trial by Edward Moses, Jr.(NLT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
10 10 utility Mail Returned as Undeliverable Wed 10/11 2:38 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable on9 Judgment from Edward Moses, Jr. Reason: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
9 9 order Judgment Thu 09/14 4:16 PM
JUDGMENT: attorney Edward Moses, Jr. and the Moses Law Firm, L.L.C. shall pay a civil fine to the Court in the amount of $15,000. Pyament shall be made to the Clerk of Court. Edward Moses, Jr. is hereby suspended, effective immediately, for a period of one year from the date of this order. Judgment shall be entered separately. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson, and Judge John W. deGravelles on 9/14/2023.(JEG)
Related: [-]
8 8 30+ pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 09/14 4:05 PM
SANCTIONS ORDER denying5 Motion to Dismiss. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, attorney Edward Moses, Jr. and the Moses Law Firm, L.L.C. shall pay a civil fine to the Court in the amount of $15,000. Pyament shall be made to the Clerk of Court. Edward Moses, Jr. is hereby suspended, effective immediately, for a period of one year from the date of this order. Judgment shall be entered separately. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson, and Judge John W. deGravelles on 9/13/2023. (JEG)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
minutes Evidentiary Hearing Fri 08/04 4:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson, and Judge John W. deGravelles. Show Cause Hearing held on 8/4/2023. This matter came this day for Show Cause Hearing why disciplinary action should not be imposed against Attorney Edward Moses, Jr. Mr. Moses appears on his own behalf. The Court reviews procedural rules and legal standard for imposing sanctions. Mr. Moses presents argument. The Court takes this matter under advisement. (Court Reporter N. Breaux.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Stewart, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 30, 2023
6 6 misc Exhibit(s) Sun 07/30 12:24 PM
Exhibit(s) to5 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State an Offense by Edward Moses, Jr.. (Moses, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
5 5 motion Dismiss Mon 07/24 3:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State an Offense by Edward Moses, Jr.(Moses, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; memorandum in support,
Att: 2 Exhibit TItle 25 Indians 5129,
Att: 3 Exhibit Texas House Resolution and Library of Congress Maps,
Att: 4 Proposed Pleading; proposed Order
Thursday, June 29, 2023
4 4 respm-cr Supplemental Brief Thu 06/29 12:30 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF TO2 MEMORANDUM in Opposition, filed by Edward Moses, Jr..(Moses, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit USCIS No Records Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit Probate Records,
Att: 3 Exhibit Executive Journal,
Att: 4 Exhibit Acknowledgement and Recognition
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 06/13 3:45 PM
ORDER: Disciplinary Proceeding set for 8/4/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian Jackson, and Judge John deGravelles. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/12/2023. (JEG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
2 2 21 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition (Not to be Used with a Motion) Thu 05/25 4:26 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Edward Moses, Jr..(Moses, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit American States Papers,
Att: 2 Affidavit Trust Extract,
Att: 3 Affidavit Trust Appendix,
Att: 4 Exhibit Trustee Registration
Thursday, May 11, 2023
1 1 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 05/11 3:15 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: within 14 days, attorney Edward Moses, Jr. shall submit a written memorandum not to exceed 25 pages showing cause why sanction should not be imposed. The Clerk of Court shall assign this Order to Show Cause a miscellaneous action number to the undersigned, and forward a copy of this order to Respondent's counsel and to the Chief Judge. All future filings related to the disciplinary proceedings against Mr. Moses shall be entered in the new miscellaneous action. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/11/2023. (JEG)
Related: [-]