Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:21-bk-31861

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:23-ap-03083
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:May 10, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC
201 Montgomery Street Suite 261
Jersey City, NJ 07302
Represented By
9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Katerra Inc., et al., by and through Daniel R. Williams, Plan Administrator
Represented By
Trey A. Monsour
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/12 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Generic Order
Monday, June 10, 2024
26 26 order Generic Order Mon 06/10 1:40 PM
Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Arbitration Related [+]. Signed on 6/10/2024. (zac4)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation
Friday, May 17, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/17 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Generic Order (Adversary)
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
24 24 order Generic Order (Adversary) Wed 05/15 1:03 PM
Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Arbitration. Signed on 5/15/2024. (zac4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation Tue 05/14 5:53 PM
Stipulation By Katerra Inc., et al., by and through Daniel R. Williams, Plan Administrator and 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC Regarding Arbitation. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Katerra Inc., et al., by and through Daniel R. Williams, Plan Administrator ). (Monsour, Trey)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
22 22 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 04/05 1:24 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 22, 2024
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Mon 01/22 2:49 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 1:00 PM. Appearances: Aaron Guerrero, Bruce Vargo, Trey Monsour, Matthew Higgins. Related [+]. Hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Motion Denied. Court to issue an Order. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, January 18, 2024
21 21 misc Exhibit List Thu 01/18 11:38 AM
Exhibit List, Witness List (Filed By Katerra Inc., et al., by and through Daniel R. Williams, Plan Administrator ) Related [+] (Monsour, Trey)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
20 20 misc Exhibit List Wed 01/17 1:46 PM
Exhibit List (Filed By 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC ) Related [+] (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Silverman Affidavit
Friday, December 29, 2023
19 19 misc Certificate Fri 12/29 7:59 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC ) Related [+] (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Hearing
Thursday, December 28, 2023
court Certificate of Notice Thu 12/28 3:51 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted S. Slater Ward. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 1/22/2024 at 01:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
court Case Reassigned-Adversary Tue 10/17 3:10 PM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
18 18 misc Brief Wed 09/27 7:29 PM
Supporting Brief (Filed By 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC ) Related [+] (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
17 17 answer Response Wed 09/20 12:59 PM
Response of Katerra Inc. to Defendant 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Related [+]. Filed by Katerra Inc., et al., by and through Daniel R. Williams, Plan Administrator (Monsour, Trey)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
16 16 misc Stipulation Wed 08/23 2:09 PM
Stipulation By Katerra Inc., et al., by and through Daniel R. Williams, Plan Administrator and Defendant 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC, Extending Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Katerra Inc., et al., by and through Daniel R. Williams, Plan Administrator ) Related [+] (Monsour, Trey)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
15 15 misc Brief Wed 08/09 12:31 PM
Brief (Filed By 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC ) Related [+] (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Att: 1 Affidavit Silverman
14 14 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 08/09 12:28 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 07/12 4:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Robert Elgidely Filed by on behalf of Katerra Inc., et al., by and through Daniel R. Williams, Plan Administrator (Elgidely, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/11 6:42 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David Grant Crooks Filed by on behalf of Katerra Inc., et al., by and through Daniel R. Williams, Plan Administrator (Crooks, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 07/10 3:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Adam T. Hamilton Filed by on behalf of Katerra Inc., et al., by and through Daniel R. Williams, Plan Administrator (Hamilton, Adam)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 24, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/24 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/24/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Thursday, June 22, 2023
9 9 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 06/22 1:11 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice - Bruce Vargo Related [+] Signed on 6/22/2023. (ElizabethMiller)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, June 16, 2023
8 8 misc Stipulation Fri 06/16 2:11 PM
Stipulation By 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC and Plaintiff. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC ). (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 06/16 2:10 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Bruce Vargo . Filed by 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/26 1:44 PM
Summons Service Executed on 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC 5/18/2023. (Monsour, Trey)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 13, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/13 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/13/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Thursday, May 11, 2023
4 4 court Summons Issued Thu 05/11 12:46 PM
Summons Issued on 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC Date Issued 5/11/2023. (HortenciaLerma)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Thu 05/11 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Wed 05/10 1:18 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC. (Monsour, Trey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Wed 05/10 1:16 PM
Adversary case 23-03083 Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Complaint by Katerra Inc., et al., by and through Daniel R. Williams, Plan Administrator against 9th Street Urban Renewal, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Monsour, Trey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet