California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:23-cv-02331
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:May 12, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Nov 09, 2023 2:45 AM PST
Defendant
The Shade Store, LLC
Represented By
Taylor Brittany Hooks
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Bruce E. Copeland
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Samantha Diane Parrish
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Lauren Marian Michals
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Crowder
Represented By
Simon Carlo Franzini
Dovel And Luner
contact info
Christin Cho
Dovel And Luner, LLP
contact info
Grace Bennett
Dovel & Luner, LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 10 2025
ORDER DENYING Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint. Re: Dkt. Nos. 99, 104, 105. Defendant is ordered to file an answer to the third amended complaint by 3/24/2025 by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
138 138 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/15 5:52 PM
NOTICE by The Shade Store, LLC of Compliance with Order Granting Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, as Modified (ECF No. 136 ) and Order Granting Defendant's Corrected Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Materials Should be Sealed, as Modified (ECF No. 137 )(Fellig, Shloime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gregory Spatz - Originally filed at Dkt. 125,
Att: 2 Exhibit 4 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-4,
Att: 3 Exhibit 11 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-11,
Att: 4 Exhibit 12 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-12,
Att: 5 Exhibit 13 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed atf Dkt. 130-13,
Att: 6 Exhibit 15 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-15,
Att: 7 Exhibit 16 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-16,
Att: 8 Exhibit 17 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-17,
Att: 9 Exhibit 25 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-25,
Att: 10 Exhibit 27 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-27,
Att: 11 Exhibit 31 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-31,
Att: 12 Exhibit 32 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-32,
Att: 13 Exhibit 35 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-35,
Att: 14 Exhibit 41 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-41,
Att: 15 Exhibit 42 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-42,
Att: 16 Exhibit 43 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-43,
Att: 17 Exhibit 44 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-44,
Att: 18 Exhibit 45 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-45,
Att: 19 Exhibit 55 to Jakopchek Decl. - Originally filed at Dkt. 130-55
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
137 137 3 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Tue 05/13 11:51 AM
ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Corrected Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed, As Modified. Re: Dkt. Nos. 129 , 133 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
136 136 3 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Tue 05/13 11:47 AM
ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, As Modified. Re: Dkt. No. 126 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
135 135 3 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Tue 05/13 11:44 AM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed, As Modified. Re: Dkt. Nos. 111 , 115 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]