New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:23-cv-02588
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 12, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court of New Jersey, Union County, UNN-L-000876-23
Last checked: Thursday Nov 09, 2023 6:15 AM EST
Defendant
A. DUIE PYLE INC.
650 WESTTOWN ROAD
WEST CHESTER, PA 19380
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER J. MORAN
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Plaintiff
RAUL SOTO
17 QUEEN COURT
HILLSIDE, NJ 07205
Represented By
ALAN ILYA KRAMINSKY, I
Law Offices Of Steven A. Varano, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/24 1:19 PM
ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 6/24/2025. Telephone Status Conference set for 7/8/2025 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 3/24/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 03/31 9:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/24/2025. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
25 25 misc Status Report Wed 03/19 5:12 PM
STATUS REPORT by All Defendants. (MORAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JACK O'CONNOR on behalf of A. DUIE PYLE INC. (O'CONNOR, JACK)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
23 23 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/27 9:37 AM
TEXT ORDER - The Court will hold a telephonic status conference in this matter on March 24, 2025, at 10:00 a.m., which the parties shall join by dialing 973-437-5535, access code 464 778 560#. Three business days prior to the conference, the parties shall file a joint status letter, not to exceed three pages. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/27/2025. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 12/30 2:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 12/4/2024. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
22 22 misc Status Report Mon 12/02 10:05 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by A. DUIE PYLE INC.. (MORAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 17, 2024
21 21 order Order Sun 11/17 7:07 PM
TEXT ORDER: The status conference in this matter originally scheduled for December 5, 2024, at 2:00 p.m., will now take place on December 4, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall join the conference by dialing 973-437-5535, access code 621 366 816#. Three business days prior to the conference, the parties shall file a joint status letter, not to exceed three pages double-spaced. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on November 17, 2024. (ame)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
20 20 misc Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/03 4:03 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOSEPH P. SLAWINSKI terminated. Attorney STEVEN A. VARANO for RAUL SOTO added.. (VARANO, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/03 3:59 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ALAN ILYA KRAMINSKY, I terminated. Attorney STEVEN A. VARANO for RAUL SOTO added.. (VARANO, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/03 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH P. SLAWINSKI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SLAWINSKI, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 24, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/26 9:54 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/5/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Fact Discovery due by 11/25/2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 8/24/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 08/28 2:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 8/23/2024. Order filed. (spc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
16 16 misc Status Report Tue 08/20 10:00 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by A. DUIE PYLE INC.. (MORAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/04 10:19 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/23/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Fact Discovery due by 8/23/2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 6/4/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 06/04 3:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 5/24/2024. Order filed. (spc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Thu 05/23 3:11 PM
STATUS REPORT by A. DUIE PYLE INC.. (MORAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/09 11:46 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/24/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Fact Discovery due by 5/24/2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/9/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 02/09 4:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 2/9/2024. Order filed. (spc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Tue 02/06 12:23 PM
Letter from Alan Kraminsky, Esq.. (KRAMINSKY, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 10/30 4:53 PM
ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/9/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/30/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 10/30 4:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 10/30/2023. Order to be filed. (spc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
10 10 misc Letter Wed 10/25 3:28 PM
Letter from Alan Kraminsky, Esq.. (KRAMINSKY, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
9 9 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 09/19 5:41 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/19/2023. (mfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/27 3:33 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/30/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Amended Pleadings due by 10/20/2023. Fact Discovery due by 3/22/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 10/20/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/27/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 07/26 7:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Scheduling Conference held on 7/21/2023. Scheduling order to be filed. (spc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
7 7 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 07/18 4:59 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by A. DUIE PYLE INC..(MORAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
6 6 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 06/20 11:45 AM
TEXT ORDER -- The Rule 16 conference scheduled in DE5 Order will now be heard on 7/21/2023 at 02:30 pm using the same dial in and access code. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 6/20/2023. (spc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 06/15 12:40 PM
ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 7/7/2023 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 6/15/2023. (spc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/02 3:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by A. DUIE PYLE INC..(MORAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 05/15 3:37 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document3 submitted by A. DUIE PYLE INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/2/2023. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
3 3 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 05/12 4:16 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to A. DUIE PYLE INC.. Attorney CHRISTOPHER J. MORAN for A. DUIE PYLE INC. added. (MORAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 05/12 4:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by A. DUIE PYLE INC. identifying A. DUIE PYLE INC. as Corporate Parent.. (MORAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/12 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by A. DUIE PYLE INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Union County, case number UNN-L-000876-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14313208), filed by A. DUIE PYLE INC..(MORAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Affidavit of Service,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Richard Gadus
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/15 8:44 AM
Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, )
Related: [-]