GLOBAL ASSOCIATION OF RISK PROFESSIONALS, INC. v. PEREZ
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael E Farbiarz |
Referred: | James B Clark |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02594 |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Cause | 18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2023 |
Re-opened: | Feb 21, 2024 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 09, 2023 6:16 AM EST |
Defendant
LUBNA PEREZ
|
|
Plaintiff
GLOBAL ASSOCIATION OF RISK PROFESSIONALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 2/21/2024. (jd, ) (Main Document 17 replaced on 2/21/2024) (jd, ) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 12/18 10:00 AM
Reset Deadlines: Administrative Termination deadline set for 2/13/2024 (ro, ) |
||
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Wed 12/13 3:52 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Courts order entered on September 11, 2023 is hereby extended to 60 days from today, February 11, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 12/13/2023. (ro, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Letter from James S. Yu of Seyfarth Shaw LLP requesting that the Court enter a 60-day administrative order to allow the parties to formalize the settlement terms and cancel the upcoming settlement conference, currently scheduled for December 14, 2023. (YU, JAMES) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() LETTER ORDER re13 Adjourning the Settlement Conference to 12/14/2023 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/30/2023. (jd, ) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Letter from James S. Yu dated October 26, 2023 requesting an adjournment of the Settlement Conference currently scheduled for November 16, 2023. (YU, JAMES) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() LETTER ORDER Scheduling a Settlement Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 1:00 PM; All Counsel and clients with full settlement authority shall be present, in-person at the conference. The parties are to submit separate confidential ex parte settlement position papers not to exceed five (5) pages, by no later than 11/13/2023. Such letters are not to be filed, but are to be sent directly to Chambers via email. Staying Defendant's time to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint, pending the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/23/2023. (jd, ) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY A. COHEN on behalf of GLOBAL ASSOCIATION OF RISK PROFESSIONALS, INC. (COHEN, JEREMY) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 10/23 2:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 10/23/2023. (seb) |
||
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() LETTER ORDER Scheduling a Telephone Conference set for 10/23/2023 at 10:30 AM; Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/12/2023. (jd, ) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by GLOBAL ASSOCIATION OF RISK PROFESSIONALS, INC.. LUBNA PEREZ served on 10/3/2023, answer due 10/24/2023. (YU, JAMES) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Letter from James S. Yu of Seyfarth Shaw LLP to Judge Farbiarz, requesting that the Court restore this matter to the active docket re7 Order 60-Day Administrative Termination. (YU, JAMES) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 11/13/2023. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 9/11/2023. (jd, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Letter from James S. Yu of Seyfarth Shaw LLP, requesting that the Court enter a 60-day administrative order, dismissing the action without prejudice, to allow time for the parties to finalize settlement. (YU, JAMES) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Returnable 9/6/2023. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ro, ) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 05/19 1:42 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/19/2023. (mmb, ) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUBNA PEREZ. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, ) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLOBAL ASSOCIATION OF RISK PROFESSIONALS, INC.. (YU, JAMES) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against LUBNA PEREZ ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14313675), filed by GLOBAL ASSOCIATION OF RISK PROFESSIONALS, INC..(YU, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 05/15 8:53 AM
Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, ) |