New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:23-cv-04001
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:May 12, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Nov 09, 2023 6:05 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Oswaldo Hugo Benavides
Represented By
Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Nesenoff & Miltenberg, L.L.P.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Julius Bowditch
Represented By
Joshua Joseph Lax
Fasullo Giordano And Dimaggio LLP
contact info
Defendant
Oswaldo Hugo Benavides
Represented By
Helen J. Setton
Nesenoff & Miltenberg, LLP
contact info
Andrew Todd Miltenberg
Nesenoff & Miltenberg, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Fordham University
Represented By
Jennifer A. McLaughlin
Cullen & Dykman LLP
contact info
Ryan Soebke
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-10
Defendant
Nancy Hark
Fordham University Faculty Memorial Hall, Room 506 2540 Belmont Avenue
Bronx, NY 10458
Plaintiff
Julius Bowditch
Represented By
Joshua Joseph Lax
Fasullo Giordano And Dimaggio LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, August 30, 2024
notice Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge Fri 08/30 5:49 PM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 07/26 5:08 PM
ORDER denying as moot18 Motion to Dismiss Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that in light of Defendants' December 1, 2023 motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Defendants September 27, 2023 motion to dismiss the Complaint is denied as MOOT. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the open motion at Doc. 6. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/26/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
38 38 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 01/12 2:01 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:33 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the amended complaint of plaintiff Julius Bowditch . . Document filed by Fordham University, Nancy Hark..(McLaughlin, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
37 37 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/27 7:56 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:33 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the amended complaint of plaintiff Julius Bowditch . . Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
36 36 respoth Amended Answer to Counterclaim Thu 12/14 2:53 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to31 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
35 35 respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 12/01 1:35 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:33 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the amended complaint of plaintiff Julius Bowditch . . Document filed by Fordham University, Nancy Hark..(McLaughlin, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Affirmation in Support of Motion Fri 12/01 1:33 PM
AFFIRMATION of Jennifer A. McLaughlin in Support re:33 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the amended complaint of plaintiff Julius Bowditch .. Document filed by Fordham University, Nancy Hark..(McLaughlin, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint
33 33 motion Dismiss Fri 12/01 1:28 PM
FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the amended complaint of plaintiff Julius Bowditch . Document filed by Fordham University, Nancy Hark..(McLaughlin, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/30 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Bernstein on behalf of Oswaldo Hugo Benavides..(Bernstein, Stuart)
Related: [-]
31 31 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Thu 11/30 3:12 PM
ANSWER to28 Amended Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Julius Bowditch. Document filed by Oswaldo Hugo Benavides..(Miltenberg, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
30 30 service Summons Issued Thu 10/26 2:50 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy Hark..(gp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
29 29 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Wed 10/25 7:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Nancy Hark, Esq., re:28 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
28 28 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/25 7:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending7 Complaint against Oswaldo Hugo Benavides, Fordham University, Nancy Hark, John and Jane Does 1-10 with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Julius Bowditch. Related document:7 Complaint..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
27 27 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 10/20 5:22 PM
ANSWER to23 Counterclaim. Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 10/12 1:49 PM
ORDER granting25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/12/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 10/12 1:50 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2023. Motions due by 12/1/2023. Responses due by 12/27/2023 Replies due by 1/12/2024. (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 10/11 11:18 AM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Proposed Schedule addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Joshua J. Lax dated October 11, 2023. Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Helen J. Setton on behalf of Oswaldo Hugo Benavides..(Setton, Helen)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 09/29 4:40 PM
ANSWER to7 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Julius Bowditch. Document filed by Oswaldo Hugo Benavides..(Miltenberg, Andrew)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Todd Miltenberg on behalf of Oswaldo Hugo Benavides..(Miltenberg, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
21 21 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/27 2:56 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fordham University..(McLaughlin, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 09/27 2:54 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:18 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Fordham University..(McLaughlin, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 09/27 2:50 PM
DECLARATION of Jennifer A. McLaughlin in Support re:18 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Fordham University..(McLaughlin, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint
18 18 motion Dismiss Wed 09/27 2:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Fordham University..(McLaughlin, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 08/30 11:36 AM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Ryan Soebke dated August 29, 2023. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/30/2023) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/30 11:36 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Fordham University answer due 9/27/2023. (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/29 10:03 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Ryan Soebke dated August 29, 2023. Document filed by Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 08/02 2:46 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Ryan Soebke dated August 1, 2023. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/2/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 08/02 2:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Oswaldo Hugo Benavides waiver sent on 7/31/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 08/02 2:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Oswaldo Hugo Benavides served on 7/25/2023, answer due 8/15/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 08/02 2:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fordham University served on 7/13/2023, answer due 8/3/2023. Service was accepted by Daniel Couriel, Office of General Counsel for Fordham University. Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/02 2:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Fordham University answer due 9/6/2023. (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/01 1:49 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Ryan Soebke dated August 1, 2023. Document filed by Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/01 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Soebke on behalf of Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/01 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer A. McLaughlin on behalf of Fordham University..(McLaughlin, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
8 8 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/16 4:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Complaint Tue 05/16 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Oswaldo Hugo Benavides, Fordham University. Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 05/15 3:12 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fordham University..(gp)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 05/15 3:11 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oswaldo Hugo Benavides..(gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 05/15 10:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua Joseph Lax to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/15 10:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joshua Joseph Lax to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Nature of Suit section on the PDF has multiple selections. Place an X in ONE Nature of Suit box and Citizenship of Principle Parties select on the PDF has multiple selection. Place an X in ONE defendants selection box and refile the Civil Cover Sheet.refile.. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 05/15 3:11 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 05/15 3:11 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 05/15 3:11 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/12 9:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oswaldo Hugo Benavides, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/12 9:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fordham University, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/12 9:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/12 9:09 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27736186)Document filed by Julius Bowditch..(Lax, Joshua)
Related: [-]